This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 07:40:10

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Calderon against Frakes in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 4:19-CV-03073
  • Filing Date 07/22/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Other Prisoner
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Pro Se Docket
  • Courthouse Nebraska District

Party Details

  • Respondent Scott Frakes
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Interested Party Nebraska Attorney General
  • Represented By
    • Douglas J. Peterson
  • Petitioner Raul Calderon
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Appointm...

Free with Subscription
#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The pending Petition (filing no....

Free with Subscription
#7

(#7) MOTION to Extend on behalf of Petitioner Raul Calderon....

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Petitioner Raul ...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) AMENDED NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of compla...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint file...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) MOTION to appoint counsel on behalf of Petitioner Raul ...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus with receipt number ...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (filing no. #6 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time (filing no. #7 ) is granted. No further extensions shall be granted. Petitioner shall have until September 30, 2019, to file an amended petition in accordance with the court's July 25, 2019 Memorandum and Order (filing no. #5 ). Petitioner is encouraged to use the official Form AO 241 previously provided to him. To avoid confusion, any document Petitioner sends to the clerk of the court for filing in this case must clearly display the case number. Failure to file an amended petition will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: September 30, 2019: Check for amended petition. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
  • 08/28/2019
  • (#7) MOTION to Extend on behalf of Petitioner Raul Calderon. (2 exact copies received) (LKO) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
  • 08/12/2019
  • (#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Petitioner Raul Calderon. (LKO) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
  • 07/25/2019
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The pending Petition (filing no. #1 ) is deemed insufficient and the court will not act upon it. By August 26, 2019, Petitioner shall file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus that is originally signed under penalty of perjury. Petitioner is encouraged to use the enclosed official Form AO 241. To avoid confusion, any document Petitioner sends to the clerk of the court for filing in this case must clearly display the case number. Failure to file an amended petition in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO 241 ("Petition for Relief From a Conviction or Sentence By a Person in State Custody"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: August 26, 2019: Check for amended petition. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (filing no. #2 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion after Petitioner files an amended petition in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with Form AO 241)(LKO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#4) AMENDED NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of Raul Calderon on 7/22/19. Receipt number 4007614, in the amount of $5.00. (LKO) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#2) MOTION to appoint counsel on behalf of Petitioner Raul Calderon. (LKO) Modified on 7/22/2019 to reflect correct event type (LKO). (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus with receipt number 4007614, in the amount of $5 filed by pro se petitioner Raul Calderon. (LKO) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.