This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2022 at 10:43:30 (UTC).

Calderon v. Conagra Brands Inc

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Calderon filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Conagra Brands Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian C. Buescher and Michael D. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00231

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Buescher

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramiro Calderon

Omaha, NE 68104

Defendant

Conagra Brands Inc doing business as Conagra Foods Pension Plan

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Ramiro Calderon. (LKO) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#4

(#4) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2022-04: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Filing No. #2 , is denied. Plaintiff shall pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order will result in this matter being dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: August 15, 2022: deadline for Plaintiff to pay $402.00 filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LRM) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#7

(#7) REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Pursuant to the supervising pro se judge's order of August 9, 2022 (Filing No. 6 ), this case is reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition and Magistrate Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Pursuant to the supervising pro se judge's order of August 9, 2022 (Filing No. 6 ), this case is reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition and Magistrate Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER - The filing fee has been paid in this case. At the direction of the Court, this case is removed from the pro se docket. The clerk's office shall randomly assign new judges to this case and request a reassignment order from the Chief Judge. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID on behalf of Plaintiff Ramiro Calderon. Receipt number 8064290, in the amount of $ 402.00. (MKR) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Filing No. #2 , is denied. Plaintiff shall pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order will result in this matter being dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: August 15, 2022: deadline for Plaintiff to pay $402.00 filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LRM) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2022-04: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Ramiro Calderon. (LKO) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RESTRICTED COMPLAINT against Conagra Brands Inc filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Ramiro Calderon. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conagra Foods Inc is a litigant