This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 18:24:57 (UTC).

CALDERON LOPEZ v. UNKNOWN INDIVIDUALS

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 CALDERON LOPEZ filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against UNKNOWN INDIVIDUALS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02750

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICARDO JOSE CALDERON LOPEZ

Washington, DC 20090

RICARDO JOSE CALDERON LOPEZ doing business as STARLIGHT CONSULTING SERVICES

900 Brentwood Road Ne, General Delivery

Washington, DC 20090

Defendant

UNKNOWN INDIVIDUALS

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/08/2019. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/08/2019. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO DECLINE TO TRIAL BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON LOPEZ (zmc) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON LOPEZ. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-1851. (zmc) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON LOPEZ (zmc) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against UNKNOWN INDIVIDUALS with Jury Demand filed by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON LOPEZ. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zmc) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/08/2019. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/08/2019. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO DECLINE TO TRIAL BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON LOPEZ (zmc) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON LOPEZ. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-1851. (zmc) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON LOPEZ (zmc) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against UNKNOWN INDIVIDUALS with Jury Demand filed by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON LOPEZ. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zmc) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 09/16/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less