This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 07:26:15 (UTC).

Calderas v. AK Tube, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Calderas filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against AK Tube, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02431

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlos Calderas

Defendant

AK Tube, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew J.P. Coffman

Attorney at Coffman Legal - Columbus

1550 Old Henderson Road

Columbus, OH 43220

Daniel I. Bryant

Attorney at Bryant Legal, LLC

1550 Old Henderson Road

Columbus, OH 43220

Defendant Attorneys

Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - Cincinnati

26Th Floor, 201 East Fifth Street, Pnc Center

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Ryan M. Martin

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - Cincinnati

26Th Floor, 201 East Fifth Street, Pnc Center

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 12/6/19. Defendant's Motion to extend time to answer the Complaint (Doc. #10 ) is granted with a further extension until 1/24/20. Counsel shall use the time between now and then to continue discussions and exchange documents. Counsel shall advise Court prior to 1/24/20 if a resolution is reached; if not, counsel shall jointly call Chambers by 1/24/20 to schedule a Case Management Conference. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/6/19. (S,Na) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#10

(#10) Agreed Order (Motion for an extension of time to answer, move, or plead to Plaintiff's Complaint until 1/20/20 filed by Defendant AK Tube, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Goetz-Anderson, Jamie) Modified text on 12/8/2019 (D,TM). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit A - Consent to Join as Opt-In Plaintiff

#9

(#9) Notice of Filing Consent to Join Form of Opt-In Plaintiff filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join as Opt-In Plaintiff)(Bryant, Daniel) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#8

(#8) Attorney Appearance by Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson filed by on behalf of AK Tube, LLC. (Goetz-Anderson, Jamie) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#7

(#7) Attorney Appearance by Ryan M. Martin filed by on behalf of AK Tube, LLC. (Martin, Ryan) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Consent to Join - Scruggs

#6

(#6) Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join - Scruggs)(Coffman, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit A - Consent to Join

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join)(Coffman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Carlos Calderas. AK Tube, LLC waiver sent on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019 filed on behalf of Carlos Calderas (Coffman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/18/2019. (D,TM) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - February 13 - February 19, 2017 Pay Stub

1 #3

Exhibit C - April 9 - April 15, 2018 Pay Stub

1 #2

Exhibit B - February 6 - February 12, 2017 Pay Stub

1 #1

Exhibit A - Calderas Consent to Join

#1

(#1) Collective and Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act and Ohio Law with jury demand against AK Tube, LLC. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9580672.. Filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Calderas Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit B - February 6 - February 12, 2017 Pay Stub, #3 Exhibit C - April 9 - April 15, 2018 Pay Stub, #4 Exhibit D - February 13 - February 19, 2017 Pay Stub, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coffman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 12/6/19. Defendant's Motion to extend time to answer the Complaint (Doc. #10 ) is granted with a further extension until 1/24/20. Counsel shall use the time between now and then to continue discussions and exchange documents. Counsel shall advise Court prior to 1/24/20 if a resolution is reached; if not, counsel shall jointly call Chambers by 1/24/20 to schedule a Case Management Conference. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/6/19. (S,Na) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Agreed Order (Motion for an extension of time to answer, move, or plead to Plaintiff's Complaint until 1/20/20 filed by Defendant AK Tube, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Goetz-Anderson, Jamie) Modified text on 12/8/2019 (D,TM). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 12/6/19 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Filing Consent to Join Form of Opt-In Plaintiff filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join as Opt-In Plaintiff)(Bryant, Daniel) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Attorney Appearance by Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson filed by on behalf of AK Tube, LLC. (Goetz-Anderson, Jamie) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Attorney Appearance by Ryan M. Martin filed by on behalf of AK Tube, LLC. (Martin, Ryan) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join - Scruggs)(Coffman, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join)(Coffman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Carlos Calderas. AK Tube, LLC waiver sent on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019 filed on behalf of Carlos Calderas (Coffman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/18/2019. (D,TM) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (D,TM) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (D,TM) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (D,TM) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Collective and Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act and Ohio Law with jury demand against AK Tube, LLC. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9580672.. Filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Calderas Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit B - February 6 - February 12, 2017 Pay Stub, #3 Exhibit C - April 9 - April 15, 2018 Pay Stub, #4 Exhibit D - February 13 - February 19, 2017 Pay Stub, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coffman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.