This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2020 at 14:35:58 (UTC).

Calcano v. Drybar Holdings LLC

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 Calcano filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Drybar Holdings LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11389

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evelina Calcano

Defendant

Drybar Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darryn G. Solotoff

Attorney at Law Office of Darryn G. Solotoff

25 Melville Park Road, Ste 108

Melville, NY 11747

Defendant Attorneys

Minh N. Vu

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP (DC)

975 F Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

John William Egan

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP (NYC)

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018-1405

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

11 #6

Exhibit F

11 #5

Exhibit E

11 #4

Exhibit D

11 #3

Exhibit C

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

#10

9 #3

Exhibit C

9 #2

Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

#8

7 #3

Text of Proposed Order

7 #2

Vu Aff. Ex. A - Certificates of Good Standing

#7

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Drybar Holdings LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Evelina Calcano. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Solotoff, Darryn) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #11 Status Report, filed by Drybar Holdings LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. This case will remain STAYED until August 3, 2020 to permit the resolution of motions to dismiss in similar matters currently pending before the Court and elsewhere in this district. The parties are directed to submit a joint status letter to the Court no later than July 27, 2020. In addition, no later than five days after the issuance of any opinion in this district relevant to the claims asserted in this case, the parties are directed to submit a joint letter addressing the impact of the decision on this case and the continued need for a stay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/29/2020) (ama) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATUS REPORT. Joint pursuant to the Court's March 3, 2020 Order (DKT No. 10) Document filed by Drybar Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Egan, John) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCase Stayed (ama) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: granting #9 Letter Motion to Stay. Application GRANTED. This case is STAYED until August 3, 2020 to permit the resolution of motions to dismiss in similar matters currently pending before the Court and elsewhere in this district. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 17, 2020 is adjourned sine die. The parties are directed to submit a joint status letter to the Court no later than July 27, 2020. In addition, no later than five days after the issuance of any opinion in this district relevant to the claims asserted in this case, the parties are directed to submit a joint letter addressing the impact of the decision on this case and the continued need for a stay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/03/2020) (ama) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER MOTION to Stay this action to August 3, 2020 addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John W. Egan dated March 3, 2020. Document filed by Drybar Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Egan, John) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Minh N. Vu, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/27/2020) (mro) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Minh N. Vu, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18594047. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Minh N. Vu, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18594047. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Drybar Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Minh N. Vu, Esq., #2 Vu Aff. Ex. A - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vu, Minh) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Drybar Holdings LLC waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Evelina Calcano. (Solotoff, Darryn) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: Initial Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/16/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Drybar Holdings LLC. (sj) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sj) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Drybar Holdings LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Evelina Calcano. (Solotoff, Darryn) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Solotoff, Darryn) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Drybar Holdings LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18270725)Document filed by Evelina Calcano.(Solotoff, Darryn) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Drybar Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John William Egan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Minh N. Vu