This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2020 at 09:57:52 (UTC).

CALANDRA v. DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 CALANDRA filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00536

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICOLINE CALANDRA

Defendant

DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sammy Y. Sugiura

Attorney at Edgar Snyder & Associates

Us Steel Tower, 600 Grant Street, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Sammy Sugiura

Attorney at Edgar Snyder & Associates

Us Steel Tower, 600 Grant Street, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Katelyn W. McCombs

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Emilie R. Hammerstein

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER IN ALL CIVIL CASES RELATED TO CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 5/4/2020. (av) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement identifying BlackRock, Inc. and The Vanguard Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC.. (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn W. McCombs on behalf of DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC. (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Emilie R. Hammerstein on behalf of DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC. (Hammerstein, Emilie) Modified text on 4/24/2020. (jmm) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Proposed Rule 26(f) report (av) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 6/29/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/29/2020; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 6/29/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/23/2020. (av) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NICOLINE CALANDRA. DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC. waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Sugiura, Sammy) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5560023), filed by NICOLINE CALANDRA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 05/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER IN ALL CIVIL CASES RELATED TO CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 5/4/2020. (av) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 04/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement identifying BlackRock, Inc. and The Vanguard Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC.. (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn W. McCombs on behalf of DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC. (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Emilie R. Hammerstein on behalf of DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC. (Hammerstein, Emilie) Modified text on 4/24/2020. (jmm) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Rule 26(f) report (av) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 6/29/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/29/2020; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 6/29/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/23/2020. (av) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NICOLINE CALANDRA. DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC. waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Sugiura, Sammy) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5560023), filed by NICOLINE CALANDRA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DICK'S SPORTING GOODS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sammy Y. Sugiura