This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2020 at 07:40:20 (UTC).

Caiyapat-Green v. Chase Bank (USA), N.A.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 Caiyapat-Green filed an Other lawsuit against Chase Bank USA , N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas P. Barber and Sean P. Flynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03175

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas P. Barber

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sayoomporn Caiyapat-Green

Defendant

Chase Bank (USA), N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher W.E. Boss

Attorney at Boss Law PLLC

9887 4Th St N Ste 202

St Petersburg, FL 33702

Andrea Dufresne Abercrombie

Attorney at Boss Law PLLC

9887 4Th St N Ste 202

St Petersburg, FL 33702

Defendant Attorney

Joseph H. Picone

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1900

Tampa, FL 33602-5148

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Chase Bank (USA), N.A. (Picone, Joseph) Modified text on 2/13/2020 (JNB). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#15

(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Picone, Joseph) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Sayoomporn Caiyapat-Green. (Boss, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Chase Bank (USA), N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. - Parent of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., a publicly traded company (symbol: JPM) for Chase Bank (USA), N.A. (Picone, Joseph) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (JNB). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Chase Bank (USA), N.A.. (Picone, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Amended Appearance by Joseph H. Picone on behalf of Chase Bank (USA), N.A. (Picone, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Picone on behalf of Chase Bank (USA), N.A. (Picone, Joseph) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sayoomporn Caiyapat-Green. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sayoomporn Caiyapat-Green. Related case(s): no (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) RETURN of service executed on 1/2/2020 by Sayoomporn Caiyapat-Green as to Chase Bank (USA), N.A.. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 12/30/2019. (SRC) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Chase Bank (USA), N.A. (JNB) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Chase Bank (USA), N.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16296955) filed by Sayoomporn Caiyapat-Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Chase Bank (USA), N.A. (Picone, Joseph) Modified text on 2/13/2020 (JNB). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Picone, Joseph) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may conduct their case management conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/27/2020. (NCR) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Sayoomporn Caiyapat-Green. (Boss, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant Chase Bank (USA), N.A.'s answer is due 2/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/15/2020. (NCR) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Chase Bank (USA), N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. - Parent of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., a publicly traded company (symbol: JPM) for Chase Bank (USA), N.A. (Picone, Joseph) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (JNB). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Chase Bank (USA), N.A.. (Picone, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Amended Appearance by Joseph H. Picone on behalf of Chase Bank (USA), N.A. (Picone, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Picone on behalf of Chase Bank (USA), N.A. (Picone, Joseph) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sayoomporn Caiyapat-Green. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sayoomporn Caiyapat-Green. Related case(s): no (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of service executed on 1/2/2020 by Sayoomporn Caiyapat-Green as to Chase Bank (USA), N.A.. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 12/30/2019. (SRC) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Chase Bank (USA), N.A. (JNB) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-3175-T-60SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chase Bank (USA), N.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16296955) filed by Sayoomporn Caiyapat-Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher W. E. Boss