This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2019 at 08:09:08 (UTC).

Cagle v. Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 Cagle filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Specialty Retailers, Inc , d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon A. York and J. Daniel Breen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01180

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

Presiding Judge

J. Daniel Breen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynne Cagle

Defendant

Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation

Not Classified By Court

Mike Wilson

Paris, TN 38242

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blair P. Durham

404 James Robertson Pkw, Ste. 1714

Nashville, TN 37219

Defendant Attorneys

David A. Changas

Attorney at LEWIS THOMASON KING KRIEG & WALDROP

424 Church Street, Ste 2500

Nashville, TN 37201

Lucas Allen Davidson

Attorney at LEWIS THOMASON KING KING & WALDROP, P.C

424 Church Street, Suite 2500

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 11/30/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2020 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Motions in Limine, Proposed Jury Instructions and Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/18/2020. (ejc) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 12/19/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2019. Discovery due by 6/22/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2019. Motions due by 7/23/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 9/26/2019. (ars) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/26/2019) (ars). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit Proposed Standard Track Scheduling Order

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to File Standard Tract Scheduling Order by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Standard Track Scheduling Order)(Davidson, Lucas) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation Of Substitution of Counsel (Davidson, Lucas) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation.(Changas, David) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation. (Changas, David) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B. Notices to Clerk and Plaintiff's Counsel

1 #1

Exhibit A. Original Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation from Henry County Circuit Court, case number 4040 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3150912), filed by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Notices to Clerk and Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Changas, David) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 11/30/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2020 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Motions in Limine, Proposed Jury Instructions and Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/18/2020. (ejc) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TEXT ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 9/27/2019. Note: text only, no image associated with entry. (ars) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 12/19/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2019. Discovery due by 6/22/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2019. Motions due by 7/23/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 9/26/2019. (ars) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/26/2019) (ars). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • (#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Scheduling Conference held on 9/26/2019. Present were attys Waters and Davison. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter FTR.) (ars) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint MOTION to File Standard Tract Scheduling Order by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Standard Track Scheduling Order)(Davidson, Lucas) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation Of Substitution of Counsel (Davidson, Lucas) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation.(Changas, David) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • (#7) SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 09/26/2019, 10:00 A.M. CT in Courtroom #3, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation. (Changas, David) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation from Henry County Circuit Court, case number 4040 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3150912), filed by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Notices to Clerk and Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Changas, David) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.