This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2021 at 07:04:04 (UTC).

Caggiano v. Kothandaraman et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Caggiano filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Kothandaraman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley, Virginia K. DeMarchi and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-08715

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Caggiano

Defendants

Eric Branderiz

Steven J. Gomo

Richard Mora

Thurman J. Rodgers

Badrinarayanan Kothandaraman

Mandy Yang

Enphase Energy, Inc.

Benjamin Kortlang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosanne L. Mah

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

388 Market Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Gregory Mark Nespole

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

55 Broadway, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#14

#15

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Frank Caggiano NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 2/6/2021) (Entered: 02/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GRANTING #5 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/4/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD DKT ENTRY #12. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. RE #9 . Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • Docket(#10) ***Please disregard, issued in error. Case to be reassigned to BLF.*** CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020) Modified on 12/28/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TEMPORARILY LIFT STAY TO RELATE AND CONSOLIDATE 20-CV-08715-JSC WITH 20-CV-04623-BLF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/24/2020. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2020) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frank Caggiano.. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Eric Branderiz, Enphase Energy, Inc., Steven J. Gomo, Benjamin Kortlang, Badrinarayanan Kothandaraman, Richard Mora, Thurman J. Rodgers, Mandy Yang. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY GREGORY M. NESPOLE PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15301546.) filed by Frank Caggiano. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/23/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Frank Caggiano PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT UNDER CIVIL L.R. 3-15 (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15296397.). Filed byFrank Caggiano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Enphase Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosanne L. Mah

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory M Nespole