This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/15/2021 at 08:32:33 (UTC).

Cage v. NTT Data, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Cage filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against NTT Data, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg N. Stivers and H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00122

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg N. Stivers

Referral Judge

H. Brent Brennenstuhl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricky Cage

Defendant

NTT Data Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony J. Bucher

Defendant Attorneys

J. Andrew Inman

John M.S. Carter

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Record

1 #2

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit First Amended Complaint

#9

#10

#11

#12

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by NTT Data Services, LLC. (Carter, John) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by NTT Data Services, LLC. (Carter, John) Modified to correct defendant name on 10/14/2021 (TJD). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against NTT Data, Inc., filed by Ricky Cage. (JWM) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AGREED ORDER AMENDING COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/30/2021 granting #8 Proposed Agreed Order. Plaintiff's attached First Amended Complaint is deemed as filed as of the date of this Order. NTT Data Services, LLC shall have 14 days from entry of this Order to file its Answer. cc: Counsel(JWM) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Agreed Order to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint) by Ricky Cage. (Bucher, Anthony) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent NTT Data International, LLC, Other Affiliate NTT Data Corporation, Other Affiliate NTT Data Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Nippon Telegraph & Telephone Corporation for NTT Data, Inc.. by NTT Data, Inc.. (Carter, John) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 9/9/2021. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 10/21/2021 at 9:30 am CDT/10:30 am EDT. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel for the parties shall conduct a meeting of the parties by 9/30/2021. Counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report by 10/14/2021. See Order for details. cc:counsel; KL-Case Manager (JWM) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 9/8/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (DN #1 ) by NTT Data, Inc.. (Inman, J.) Modified to add docket entry relationships on 9/8/2021 (JWM). (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE to Warren Circuit Court and counsel, re #1 Notice of Removal (CDF) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren Circuit Court, Division II, case number 21-CI-00890, filed by NTT Data, Inc. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0644-3403347) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Cover Sheet) (CDF) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less