This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2023 at 08:51:40 (UTC).

Cadena v. W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Co.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 Cadena filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against W G Yates Sons Construction Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Drozd and Kendall J. Newman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00262

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Pablo Rivera Cadena

Defendant

W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James A. De Sario

Michael Nourmand

Kyle Joseph Ignatius

Defendant Attorneys

Michael John Nader

Paul M. Smith

Robert R Roginson

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) REPLY by Juan Pablo Rivera Cadena re #12 Opposition to Motion,. (Ignatius, Kyle) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#13

(#13) STATEMENT of Objection to Plaintiff's Evidence ISO Motion to Remand by Defendant W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company re #10 Motion to Remand,. (Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

12 #4

Declaration Decl of Reiswig

12 #3

Declaration Decl of Hicks

12 #2

Declaration Decl of Paul M. Smith

12 #1

Declaration Decl of Michael J. Nader

#12

(#12) OPPOSITION by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company to #10 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl of Michael J. Nader, #2 Declaration Decl of Paul M. Smith, #3 Declaration Decl of Hicks, #4 Declaration Decl of Reiswig)(Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION to REMAND to State Court: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Kyle J. Ignatius by Juan Pablo Rivera Cadena. Attorney Ignatius, Kyle Joseph added. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ignatius, Kyle) Modified on 3/14/2023 (Perdue, C.). (Entered: 03/13/2023)

#9

(#9) REPLY by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company re #7 Motion for Judgment,. (Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

#8

(#8) OPPOSITION by Juan Pablo Rivera Cadena to #5 Motion for Judgment,. (De Sario, James) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#7

(#7) AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION for JUDGMENT on the Pleadings re: 6 Minute Order by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Nader, Michael) Modified on 2/23/2023 (Rodriguez, E). Modified on 3/22/2023 (Buzo, P). (Entered: 02/17/2023)

5 #3

Proposed Order

5 #2

Proposed Order

5 #1

Declaration of Michael Nader

#5

(#5) MOTION for JUDGMENT for Judgment on Pleadings or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company. Motion Hearing SET for 4/4/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Nader, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Nader, Michael) Modified on 2/16/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Complaint 28 USC 1446d by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company. (Smith, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

2 #2

Consent Form

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) REPLY by Juan Pablo Rivera Cadena re #12 Opposition to Motion,. (Ignatius, Kyle) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) STATEMENT of Objection to Plaintiff's Evidence ISO Motion to Remand by Defendant W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company re #10 Motion to Remand,. (Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) OPPOSITION by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company to #10 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl of Michael J. Nader, #2 Declaration Decl of Paul M. Smith, #3 Declaration Decl of Hicks, #4 Declaration Decl of Reiswig)(Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/22/2023: Pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the pending #5 #7 #10 Motions are SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearings set for 4/4/2023 and 4/18/2023 are VACATED, to be reset at a later date if the court determines that oral argument is needed.(Buzo, P) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION to REMAND to State Court: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Kyle J. Ignatius by Juan Pablo Rivera Cadena. Attorney Ignatius, Kyle Joseph added. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ignatius, Kyle) Modified on 3/14/2023 (Perdue, C.). (Entered: 03/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) REPLY by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company re #7 Motion for Judgment,. (Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) OPPOSITION by Juan Pablo Rivera Cadena to #5 Motion for Judgment,. (De Sario, James) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION for JUDGMENT on the Pleadings re: 6 Minute Order by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Nader, Michael) Modified on 2/23/2023 (Rodriguez, E). Modified on 3/22/2023 (Buzo, P). (Entered: 02/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/16/2023: Defendant failed to file a notice of motion with its #5 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings or alternatively, motion to strike as required by the Local Rules. See L.R. 230(b) ("The moving party shall file a notice of motion, motion, accompanying briefs, affidavits, if appropriate, and copies of all documentary evidence that the moving party intends to submit in support of the motion.") Accordingly, defendant is directed to file a notice of motion that comports with Judge Drozd's [2-1] Standing Order and Local Rule 230(b). In addition, the parties are advised that the forthcoming notice will not alter the briefing schedule: the filing deadlines for opposition and reply briefs are calculated based on the filing date of the motion (here, that is 2/15/2023).(Buzo, P) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for JUDGMENT for Judgment on Pleadings or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company. Motion Hearing SET for 4/4/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Nader, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Nader, Michael) Modified on 2/16/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 02/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Complaint 28 USC 1446d by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company. (Smith, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil New Case Documents for DAD. (Smith, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Perdue, C.) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00311197 by W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10693218) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Declaration of Smith, #5 Declaration of Reiswig, #6 Declaration of Hicks)(Smith, Paul) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less