This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2020 at 08:41:32 (UTC).

Gabriela Cabrera v. Hot Topic, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Gabriela Cabrera filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Hot Topic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09819

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabriela Cabrera

Defendants

Hot Topic, Inc. d/b/a Boxlunch

Hot Topic, Inc. doing business as Box Lunch 4549

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

E Dayton Magallanes

Attorney at Law Offices of Dayton Magallanes

10366 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 303

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorney

Hayley Singer Grunvald

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

12275 El Camino Real Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130-2006

 

Court Documents

#8

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Hot Topic, Inc..(Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hot Topic, Inc., identifying Hot Topic. (Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint #9 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The document is stricken. (yl) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hot Topic, Inc. identifying Sycamore Partners as Corporate Parent. (Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (iv) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for March 22, 2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (droj) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **STRICKEN** ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Hot Topic, Inc..(Grunvald, Hayley) Modified on 12/15/2020 (yl). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than November 23, 2020. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, if any, and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (et) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hot Topic, Inc. answer now due 12/2/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Hot Topic, Inc..(Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Hot Topic, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Gabriela Cabrera. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hot Topic, Inc. d/b/a Boxlunch (Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hot Topic, Inc. d/b/a Boxlunch. (Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20VECV00967 Receipt No: ACACDC-28710377 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Hot Topic, Inc. d/b/a Boxlunch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Attorney Hayley Singer Grunvald added to party Hot Topic, Inc. d/b/a Boxlunch(pty:dft))(Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOT TOPIC INC is a litigant