This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2022 at 08:26:12 (UTC).

Cabrera-Cardona v. Labor

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 Cabrera-Cardona filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Labor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael P. Shea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00131

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Shea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona

Meriden, CT 06451

Defendant

Department of Labor

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2022; Discovery due by 7/26/2022 and Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2022. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Attachment

#8

(#8) RESPONSE TO 7 Order, by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona filed by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE TO 7 Order, by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona filed by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 2/24/2022 (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docket(#7) ORDER. The complaint in this case appears to be identical to that filed by the plaintiff in Cabrera-Cardona v. Labor, 3:22-cv-00130-MPS. The plaintiff is directed to show cause, via a notice filed to the docket no later than February 24, 2022, why the Court should not dismiss this action without prejudice as duplicative of her earlier-filed suit.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/10/2022. (Silva, Madeline) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE Re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2022; Discovery due by 7/26/2022 and Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2022. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Department of Labor, filed by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department Of Labor is a litigant