This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2022 at 08:26:06 (UTC).

Cabrera-Cardona v. Labor

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 Cabrera-Cardona filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Labor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael P. Shea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00130

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Shea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona

Meriden, CT 06451

Defendant

Department of Labor

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2022; Discovery due by 7/26/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2022. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Attachment

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Department of Labor* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona* *43 Dewey Avenue* *Meriden, CT 06451*. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona, #6 Notice, #1 Complaint filed by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona Signed by Clerk on 03/02/2022.(Peterson, M) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#10

(#10) USM 285 forms together with Summons, Guide for Self-Represented Litigants, OPTD, Electronic Filing Order, Standing Protective Order, Order granting the IFP motion, Consent to Electronic Notice by Prose Litigant, Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) USM 285 forms together with Summons, Guide for Self-Represented Litigants, OPTD, Electronic Filing Order, Standing Protective Order, Order granting the IFP motion, Consent to Electronic Notice by Prose Litigant, Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona, #6 Notice, #1 Complaint filed by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona Signed by Clerk on 03/02/2022.(Peterson, M) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Department of Labor* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona* *43 Dewey Avenue* *Meriden, CT 06451*. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER. The plaintiff's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED. In her motion, the plaintiff represents that she has total monthly obligations of $3,168.92, an amount that exceeds her monthly income of approximately $3,091.53 (comprised of $1,760 in government benefits per month, $689.53 in widow's pension payments per month, and $150 in income from employer Victory Church each week). The Court concludes that the plaintiff has therefore shown an inability to pay the $402 filing fee.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/10/2022. (Silva, Madeline) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE Re: Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2022; Discovery due by 7/26/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2022. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Department of Labor, filed by Wanda A. Cabrera-Cardona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department Of Labor is a litigant