This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2022 at 08:45:35 (UTC).

C.A. v. The City of Jackson, Mississippi et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 C A filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The City of Jackson, Mississippi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlton W. Reeves and LaKeysha Greer Isaac. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00171

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlton W. Reeves

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

C.A.

A.A.

A.B.

J.L.

J.M.

C.L.

C.M.

N.M.

N.W.

O.M.

P.C.

P.J.

P.M.

P.W.

Q.H.

Q.W.

R.C.

R.D.

R.H.

R.J.

164 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darryl M. Gibbs

Attorney at CHHABRA & GIBBS, PA

120 North Congress Street, Suite 200

Jackson, MS 39201

John P. Guinan - PHV

Attorney at LEVY KONIGSBERG, LLP

605 Third Avenue, 33Rd Floor

New York, NY 10158

Kimberly L. Russell - PHV

Attorney at LEVY KONIGSBERG, LLP

605 Third Avenue, 33Rd Floor

New York, NY 10158

Other Attorneys

John F. Hawkins

Attorney at HAWKINS LAW, PC

226 North President Street, P. O. Box 24627 (39225-4627)

Jackson, MS 39201

Gerald L. Kucia

Attorney at MISSISSIPPI ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

550 High Street, Suite 1100, P. O. Box 220

Jackson, MS 39205

Meade W. Mitchell

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Edderek Linnel Cole

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Margaret Z. Smith

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Orlando R. Richmond, Sr.

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Phillip S. Sykes

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Dennis Jason Childress

Attorney at WISE, CARTER, CHILD & CARAWAY, PA - Jackson

401 East Capitol Street, Suite 600, P. O. Box 651 (39205-0651)

Jackson, MS 39201

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, and Jury Trial Demand by Trilogy Engineering Services LLC (Childress, Dennis) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Jerriot Smash served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. The City of Jackson, Mississippi served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly L. Russell - PHV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly L. Russell - PHV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

4 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

4 #4

Main Document

3 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Jim Craig, Chokwe A. Lumumba, Jr, Robert Miller, Kishia Powell, Jerriot Smash, The City of Jackson, Mississippi, Trilogy Engineering Services LLC, Tony Yarber, the Mississippi State Department of Health. (LAT) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Kemker Letter re NOV 4-2021

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Consumer Notice Regarding Your Drinking Water 5-12-21

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - City of Jackson LCR Compliance Plan 022016

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Grevatt Letter 2-29-16

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Jackson Press Release

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - EPA Emergency Administrative Order 3-27-21

1 #1

Main Document

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, and Jury Trial Demand by Trilogy Engineering Services LLC (Childress, Dennis) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketSet Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/27/2022 11:00 AM on Zoom before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (HAH) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Chokwe A. Lumumba, Jr, Robert Miller, Kishia Powell, Jerriot Smash, The City of Jackson, Mississippi and Tony Yarber answer due 6/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 5/24/22 (NL) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Chokwe A. Lumumba, Jr, Robert Miller, Kishia Powell, Jerriot Smash, The City of Jackson, Mississippi, Tony Yarber (Hawkins, John) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Robert Miller served on 4/27/2022, answer due 5/18/2022. (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #22 . A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (ND) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L. Kucia on behalf of Jim Craig, the Mississippi State Department of Health (Kucia, Gerald) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kishia Powell served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File. The Court shall afford both the State Defendants and the Plaintiffs an additional ten briefing pages, such that the total page limit for the State Defendants' original and rebuttal memorandums is 45 pages total, and the page limit for the Plaintiffs' respondent's memorandum is 45 pages total. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 05/11/2022. (HAH) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Tony Yarber served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Jerriot Smash served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. The City of Jackson, Mississippi served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly L. Russell - PHV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly L. Russell - PHV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Russell - PHV, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorneys, Kimberly L. Russell and John Guinan, be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of all Plaintiffs in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 4/29/22 (NL) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for John Guinan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4823904) by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Gibbs, Darryl) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Kimberly L. Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4823863) by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Gibbs, Darryl) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Jim Craig, Chokwe A. Lumumba, Jr, Robert Miller, Kishia Powell, Jerriot Smash, The City of Jackson, Mississippi, Trilogy Engineering Services LLC, Tony Yarber, the Mississippi State Department of Health. (LAT) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jim Craig, John Does 1-40, Chokwe A. Lumumba, Jr., Robert Miller, Kishia Powell, Jerriot Smash, The City of Jackson, Mississippi, Trilogy Engineering Services LLC, Tony Yarber, and the Mississippi State Department of Health ( Filing fee $ 402 paid; receipt number AMSSDC-4799944 ) filed by C.A., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EPA Emergency Administrative Order 3-27-21, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jackson Press Release, #3 Exhibit 3 - Daugherty Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Grevatt Letter 2-29-16, #5 Exhibit 5 - City of Jackson LCR Compliance Plan 022016, #6 Exhibit 6 - Consumer Notice Regarding Your Drinking Water 5-12-21, #7 Exhibit 7 - Kemker Letter re NOV 4-2021, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where P.W. is a litigant

Latest cases where Werner Liquidation Trustee, R.D. is a litigant

Latest cases where N.M. is a litigant

Latest cases where R.C. is a litigant