This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 08:28:05 (UTC).

CA, Inc. et al v. Netflix, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 CA, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Netflix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00373

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CA Inc

Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited

Defendant

Netflix Inc

Not Classified By Court

Scott Woloson

Intervenor

Amazon Web Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin Scott Cohen

Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez

Austin Chun Teng

Deron R Dacus

Dina Wastcoat McKenney

James Michael Heinlen

Jeffrey M Ratinoff

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

John V. Picone, III

Jonathan Nathanial Powers

Melissa Michelle Davis

Nadia E. Haghighatian

Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr.

Robert Sean Hill

Robert K. Jain

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Bruce S Sostek

Defendant Attorneys

Sharif E. Jacob

Harper S Batts

22 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#267

(#267) NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER re: discovery procedures and denying pending discovery motions without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/2/2022. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#263

(#263) Case Reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#262

(#262) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #39 Stipulation to relate cases 21-cv-03649-EMC and 3:22-cv-00373-JCS.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

41 #4

Text of Proposed Order

41 #3

Exhibit C--B. Walsh Email

41 #2

Exhibit B--Netflix Buffer Management

41 #1

Exhibit A--Email exchange

41 #41

Main Document

#39

(#262) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #39 Stipulation to relate cases 21-cv-03649-EMC and 3:22-cv-00373-JCS.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, CA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Broadcom Technologies Inc. for Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited; Corporate Parent Broadcom Inc. for CA, Inc.. (Sostek, Bruce) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Sostek, Bruce) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

631 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/07/2022

Docket(#268) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2022, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telep hone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#267) NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER re: discovery procedures and denying pending discovery motions without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/2/2022. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2022

Docket(#266) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen.Based on the parties' CMC statement, the Court administratively terminates the following motions as resolved and/or moot in C-22-0373 EMC: Docket Nos. 117, 120, 126, 131, 145, 167, 168, 169, 171, and 203. It appears that the following motions have not been resolved, either in their entirety or in part in C-22-0373: Docket Nos. 143, 184, 186, 188, 200, 203, 205, 207, 208, 232, and 241. In addition, there is still pending Netflix's objection to the claim construction order issued by the E.D. Tex. court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2022

DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2022 01:30 PM. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#264) ORDER. The Court has reviewed the status report #41 filed in No. C-21-3649. Having considered such, the Court hereby orders as follows. (1) No. C-21-3649 and No. C-22-0373 are hereby COORDINATED. All future filings shall be made in No. C-21-3649 only. If an issue is raised that is applicable to one case only, the parties may specify such on the caption page of the filing. (2) The initial Case Management Conference set in No. C-22-0373 is hereby VACATED. Instead, the Court sets a Case Management Conference for both cases on March 8, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. A joint Case Management Conference statement shall be filed one week prior to the conference. The parties shall meet and confer regarding a schedule that will govern both cases.(3) For all pending and future discovery motions/disputes (including any motion for sanctions related to alleged discovery abuse), the Court refers the matters to a magistrate judge for resolution.Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/4/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#263) Case Reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#262) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #39 Stipulation to relate cases 21-cv-03649-EMC and 3:22-cv-00373-JCS.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#265) ORDER of United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. In re: Netflix, Inc. 2022-110. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022

Docket(#261) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#260) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
274 More Docket Entries
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez on behalf of Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, CA, Inc. (Dominguez, Adrienne) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Austin Chun Teng on behalf of Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, CA, Inc. (Teng, Austin) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin S. Cohen on behalf of Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, CA, Inc. (Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Michael Heinlen on behalf of Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, CA, Inc. (Heinlen, James) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr on behalf of Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, CA, Inc. (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, CA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Broadcom Technologies Inc. for Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited; Corporate Parent Broadcom Inc. for CA, Inc.. (Sostek, Bruce) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Sostek, Bruce) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021

DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Netflix, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8286487.), filed by CA, Inc., Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sostek, Bruce) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less