This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2021 at 08:11:55 (UTC).

A.C. et al v. New York City Department of Education

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 A C filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against New York City Department of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05600

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A. C.

P. D.

A.C.

Defendant

New York City Department of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary S Mayerson

Attorney at Mayerson & Associates

330 West 38 Street, Suite 600

New York, NY 10018

Defendant Attorneys

Angelique Antoinette Pesce

Attorney at New York City Law Department

2123 Avalon Drive West

New Canaan, CT 06840

Howard Steven Krebs

Attorney at N.Y.C. Law Dept.

100 Church Street

N.Y., NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angelique Antoinette Pesce on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Pesce, Angelique) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Angelique Pesce dated August 3, 2021. Granted. SO ORDERED. New York City Department of Education answer due 10/5/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/4/2021) (va) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#6

(#6) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Angelique Pesce dated August 3, 2021. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Krebs, Howard) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. New York City Department of Education served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Clerk. Document filed by A. C.; P. D.(on behalf of their disabled daughter T.C.); P. D.(individually ); A.C...(Mayerson, Gary) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education. (vf) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A. C.(Individually), A.C (on behalf of their disabled daughter T.C.), P. D.(on behalf of their disabled daughter T.C.), P. D.(individually )..(Mayerson, Gary) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mayerson, Gary) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24727372)Document filed by A. C.(Individually), A.C (on behalf of their disabled daughter T.C.) P. D.(on behalf of their disabled daughter T.C.), P. D.(individually ).(Mayerson, Gary) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angelique Antoinette Pesce on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Pesce, Angelique) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Angelique Pesce dated August 3, 2021. Granted. SO ORDERED. New York City Department of Education answer due 10/5/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/4/2021) (va) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Angelique Pesce dated August 3, 2021. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Krebs, Howard) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. New York City Department of Education served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Clerk. Document filed by A. C.; P. D.(on behalf of their disabled daughter T.C.); P. D.(individually ); A.C...(Mayerson, Gary) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education. (vf) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gary S Mayerson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand Blank; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 29,000; the County code has been modified to Richmond. (vf) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A. C.(Individually), A.C (on behalf of their disabled daughter T.C.), P. D.(on behalf of their disabled daughter T.C.), P. D.(individually )..(Mayerson, Gary) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mayerson, Gary) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24727372)Document filed by A. C.(Individually), A.C (on behalf of their disabled daughter T.C.) P. D.(on behalf of their disabled daughter T.C.), P. D.(individually ).(Mayerson, Gary) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where New York City Department of Education is a litigant