This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2022 at 12:49:07 (UTC).

C & An Investments, LLC v. Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 C An Investments, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Underwriters at Lloyd's London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02818

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C & An Investments, LLC

Defendants

Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Unidentified Parties

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Skelly Kreller

Alexandre E. Bonin

Jean-Marc Vincent Bonin

Kenneth Charles Bordes

Roland Christian Bonin

Sean Michael Regan

Defendant Attorneys

Douglas M. Kleeman

Virginia Y. Dodd

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) Request of Summons Issued as to Underwriters at Lloyd's London filed by C & An Investments, LLC re #1 Complaint,. (Kreller, Stephen) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/24/2022) (cs). Modified flattened pdf on 8/24/2022 (cs). (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (cs) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#6

(#6) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 08/26/22.(lag) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Opportunity to Opt In to the In Re Hurricane Ida Streamlined Settlement Program. (lag) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER that the parties will be presumed to agree to opt-in to the SSP, subject to the CMO #1, unless a party objects to participating in the SSP. Any such objection must be filed not later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 09/09/2022.(js) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#9

(#9) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 09/14/22.(my) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. Attorney Douglas M. Kleeman added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London(pty:dft).(Kleeman, Douglas) Modified text on 10/4/2022 (mm). (Entered: 10/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Answer to Complaint. **Document lists counsel of record, Lisa Langoff Fitzpatrick, for a party in this action who has not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this court's Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted.** (mm) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. Attorney Douglas M. Kleeman added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London(pty:dft).(Kleeman, Douglas) Modified text on 10/4/2022 (mm). (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 09/14/22.(my) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER that the parties will be presumed to agree to opt-in to the SSP, subject to the CMO #1, unless a party objects to participating in the SSP. Any such objection must be filed not later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 09/09/2022.(js) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Opportunity to Opt In to the In Re Hurricane Ida Streamlined Settlement Program. (lag) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 08/26/22.(lag) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Request for Summons Issued. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (cs) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (cs) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request of Summons Issued as to Underwriters at Lloyd's London filed by C & An Investments, LLC re #1 Complaint,. (Kreller, Stephen) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/24/2022) (cs). Modified flattened pdf on 8/24/2022 (cs). (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Underwriters at Lloyd's London (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9510078) filed by C & An Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Stephen Skelly Kreller added to party C & An Investments, LLC(pty:selreq).(Kreller, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less