This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 09:14:49 (UTC).

Han v. Otworth et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Han filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Otworth. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01569

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Han Byung-Gook

Byung-Gook Han

Defendants

Michael Otworth

Richard Brenner

Tanya Burnell

Jeffrey Fieler

Tim Glockner

Fernando Musa

John Scott

David Brenner

Michael E. Dee

Tasmin Ettefagh

Byron Roth

Nominal Defendant

PureCycle Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Ernst

Attorney at Bielli & Klauder, LLC

1204 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed against David Brenner, Richard Brenner, Tanya Burnell, Michael E. Dee, Tasmin Ettefagh, Jeffrey Fieler, Tim Glockner, Fernando Musa, Michael Otworth, PureCycle Technologies, Inc., Byron Roth, John Scott - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3736065.) - filed by Byung-Gook Han. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

1 #1

Verification

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Byung-Gook Han: For David Brenner waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Richard Brenner waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Tanya Burnell waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Michael E. Dee waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Tasmin Ettefagh waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Tim Glockner waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Fernando Musa waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Michael Otworth waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; PureCycle Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; John Scott waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Klauder, David) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Byung-Gook Han as to Defendant Byron Roth (Ernst, Ryan) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Byung-Gook Han as to Defendant Byron Roth (Ernst, Ryan) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Byung-Gook Han: For David Brenner waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Richard Brenner waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Tanya Burnell waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Michael E. Dee waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Tasmin Ettefagh waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Tim Glockner waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Fernando Musa waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; Michael Otworth waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; PureCycle Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022; John Scott waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Klauder, David) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (srs) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed against David Brenner, Richard Brenner, Tanya Burnell, Michael E. Dee, Tasmin Ettefagh, Jeffrey Fieler, Tim Glockner, Fernando Musa, Michael Otworth, PureCycle Technologies, Inc., Byron Roth, John Scott - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3736065.) - filed by Byung-Gook Han. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Ernst