This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2020 at 09:36:51 (UTC).

Byrum v. City of Soddy-Daisy et al (TV2)

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 Byrum filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Soddy-Daisy TV2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00099

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Justin Byrum

Defendants

Jeffrey Jon Rahn

The City of Soddy-Daisy, TN

City of Soddy-Daisy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clayton M Whittaker

Attorney at McKoon, Williams, Atchley & Stanley, PLLC

633 Chestnut Street, Suite 1500

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Defendant Attorneys

Reid A Spaulding

Attorney at Watson, Roach, Batson, Rowell & Lauderback PLC

1500 Riverview Tower, 900 South Gay Street, P.O. Box 131

Knoxville, TN 37901-0131

Ronald D Wells

Attorney at Robinson, Smith & Wells

633 Chestnut Street, Suite 700 Republic Centre

Chattanooga, TN 37450

 

Court Documents

#21

15 #1

Affidavit

#15

14 #1

Affidavit

#14

#13

12 #2

Exhibit Affidavit of Clayton M. Whittaker

12 #1

Exhibit Entry of Default

#12

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Summons Jeffery Jon Rahn

#3

#2

1 #2

Summons Officer Jeffrey Jon Rahn

1 #1

Summons City of Soddy-Daisy, TN

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Officer Jeffrey Rahn. filed by Jeffrey Jon Rahn(individually). (Spaulding, Reid) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Strike re #13 Application for Clerk's Default,, #14 Application for Clerk's Default, #15 Application for Clerk's Default, #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Officer Jeffrey Rahn. filed by Jeffrey Jon Rahn(individually). (Spaulding, Reid) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Strike re #13 Application for Clerk's Default,, #14 Application for Clerk's Default, #15 Application for Clerk's Default, #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Officer Jeffrey Rahn. by Jeffrey Jon Rahn(individually). (Spaulding, Reid) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Jeffrey Jon Rahn(individually). (Spaulding, Reid) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Soddy-Daisy.(Wells, Ronald) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Plaintiff's Amended Response filed by William Justin Byrum. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Jeffrey Jon Rahn(in his official capacity ) by William Justin Byrum. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Jeffrey Jon Rahn(individually) by William Justin Byrum. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ******FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOC #14 AND #15 **** APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Jeffrey Jon Rahn(individually), Jeffrey Jon Rahn(in his official capacity ) by William Justin Byrum. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Whittaker, Clayton) Modified on 6/9/2020 (BDG). Modified on 6/9/2020 (BDG). (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOC #13 *** MOTION for Default Judgment as to Officer Jeffrey Rahn. by William Justin Byrum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Clayton M. Whittaker)(Whittaker, Clayton) Modified on 6/9/2020 (BDG). (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Jeffrey Jon Rahn(individually). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lance W. Pope)(Spaulding, Reid) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Jeffrey Jon Rahn(individually). (Spaulding, Reid) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Justin Byrum. City of Soddy-Daisy served on 4/21/2020. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/16/2020. (JCK) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/16/2020. (JCK) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/16/2020. (JCK) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to City of Soddy-Daisy, Jeffrey Jon Rahn(individually), Jeffrey Jon Rahn(in his official capacity ). (Attachments: #1 Summons Jeffery Jon Rahn)(JCK) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Administrative Notice to Counsel. Informational only. No action to be taken. For future reference. Address information should not have been entered. Summons should be filed in a flattened non-fillable format. (JCK) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JCK) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4306715.), filed by William Justin Byrum. (Attachments: #1 Summons City of Soddy-Daisy, TN, #2 Summons Officer Jeffrey Jon Rahn, #3 Other Coversheet)(Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clayton M Whittaker