This case was last updated from PACER on 06/27/2021 at 08:56:00 (UTC).

Byrdsong et al v. A&E Television Networks LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Byrdsong filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against A E Television Networks LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00607

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bobby Lee Self

Cayla Martin

Tevin Traeion Spears

Michael D Jackson

Michael Green

Christopher Gibbs

Officer Jason Davis

Kristopher Fricks

Mario Moreno

Brad Blakely

Tracie Sherrill

Chauncey Kynard

Jimmy Studdard

Delandis Taylor

David Wayne Jones

Angela Totten

Joseph Waters

Melissa Barron

Defendants

Broadleaf Productions LLC

David Granger-Smith

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashley Weaver

Attorney at TRENTON GARMON AND ASSOCIATES

2024 3Rd Avenue North, Ste. 210

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jeremy Richards

Attorney at GARMON & ASSOCIATES PLLC

750 Forrest Avenue

Gadsden, AL 35901

Trenton Rogers Garmon

Attorney at Garmon & Associates, PLLC

2024 Third Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew J Winne

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT, FRANKLIN & WHITE, LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

John G Thompson, Jr

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Sharon Schneier

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10021

Amanda Levine

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10021

Jonathan R Little

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

The Clark Building, 400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203-3200

Other Attorneys

Joshua Alan Willis

Attorney at WEBB MCNEILL WALKER PC

7475 Halcyon Pointe Drive, P.O. Box 240909

Montgomery, AL 36124-0909

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by A&E Television Networks LLC, Broadleaf Productions LLC, Paul Buccieri, David Granger-Smith. (Thompson, John) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#23

(#23) ORDER Because Plaintiffs no longer bring claims against either Robert Debitetto or Keith Peek, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to terminate Robert Debitetto and Keith Peek as defendants. The court DENIES as MOOT Keith Peek's motion to dismiss and A&E Television Networks LLC, Broadleaf Productions LLC, Paul Buccieri, Robert Debitetto, and David Granger-Smiths motion to dismiss. Doc. #8 , #15 . Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/27/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#22

(#22) AMENDED COMPLAINT - First Amended Complaint against A&E Television Networks LLC, filed by Gabriel Byrdsong.(Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#21

(#21) RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mickey Busby, II. (Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#18

(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond with Brief to the Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Gabriel Byrdsong. (Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#17

(#19) TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac VicePro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac VicePro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/18/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

(#20) TEXT ORDER The Court hereby GRANTS in part #18 Plaintiff's motion for extension of time. Plaintiff now has until May 25, 2021 to file a response to Defendant Peek's motion to dismiss. Defendant Peek then has until June 1, 2021 to file a reply, if any. Until then, the court will not enter a briefing schedule on #15 the motion to dismiss by the remaining defendants. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/18/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#8

(#23) ORDER Because Plaintiffs no longer bring claims against either Robert Debitetto or Keith Peek, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to terminate Robert Debitetto and Keith Peek as defendants. The court DENIES as MOOT Keith Peek's motion to dismiss and A&E Television Networks LLC, Broadleaf Productions LLC, Paul Buccieri, Robert Debitetto, and David Granger-Smiths motion to dismiss. Doc. #8 , #15 . Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/27/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#5) Brief re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Keith Peek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Willis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) NOTICE by A&E Television Networks LLC, Broadleaf Productions LLC, Paul Buccieri, Robert Debitetto, David Granger-Smith of Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Little, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R Little on behalf of A&E Television Networks LLC, Broadleaf Productions LLC, Paul Buccieri, Robert Debitetto, David Granger-Smith (Little, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3829456 (B4601112996). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Broadleaf Productions LLC, Robert Debitetto, David Granger-Smith, Paul Buccieri, A&E Television Networks LLC from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 31-CV-2021-900135.00. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(SRD). (Thompson, John) Modified on 4/29/2021 (MEB2). (Entered: 04/29/2021)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) TEXT ORDER: the Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion for Expansion of Page Limitation Governing Rule 12 Motions #24 . Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 6/23/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by A&E Television Networks LLC, Broadleaf Productions LLC, Paul Buccieri, David Granger-Smith. (Thompson, John) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER Because Plaintiffs no longer bring claims against either Robert Debitetto or Keith Peek, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to terminate Robert Debitetto and Keith Peek as defendants. The court DENIES as MOOT Keith Peek's motion to dismiss and A&E Television Networks LLC, Broadleaf Productions LLC, Paul Buccieri, Robert Debitetto, and David Granger-Smiths motion to dismiss. Doc. #8 , #15 . Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/27/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) AMENDED COMPLAINT - First Amended Complaint against A&E Television Networks LLC, filed by Gabriel Byrdsong.(Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mickey Busby, II. (Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ORDER The Court hereby GRANTS in part #18 Plaintiff's motion for extension of time. Plaintiff now has until May 25, 2021 to file a response to Defendant Peek's motion to dismiss. Defendant Peek then has until June 1, 2021 to file a reply, if any. Until then, the court will not enter a briefing schedule on #15 the motion to dismiss by the remaining defendants. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/18/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac VicePro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac VicePro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/18/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond with Brief to the Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Gabriel Byrdsong. (Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3837815 (B4601113315). (Thompson, John) Modified on 5/12/2021 (MEB2). (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3837806 (B4601113314). (Thompson, John) Modified on 5/12/2021 (MEB2). (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Brief re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Keith Peek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Willis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Keith Peek. (Willis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by A&E Television Networks LLC. filed by A&E Television Networks LLC (Little, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadleaf Productions LLC. filed by Broadleaf Productions LLC (Little, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Brief re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Keith Peek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Willis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Keith Peek. (Willis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by A&E Television Networks LLC, Broadleaf Productions LLC, Paul Buccieri, Robert Debitetto, David Granger-Smith of Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Little, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R Little on behalf of A&E Television Networks LLC, Broadleaf Productions LLC, Paul Buccieri, Robert Debitetto, David Granger-Smith (Little, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3829456 (B4601112996). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Broadleaf Productions LLC, Robert Debitetto, David Granger-Smith, Paul Buccieri, A&E Television Networks LLC from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 31-CV-2021-900135.00. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(SRD). (Thompson, John) Modified on 4/29/2021 (MEB2). (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Broadleaf Productions LLC, Robert Debitetto, David Granger-Smith, Paul Buccieri, A&E Television Networks LLC from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 31-CV-2021-900135.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SRD) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Alan Willis