This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2021 at 09:13:51 (UTC).

Dena Byrd v. Drivers Management, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Dena Byrd filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Drivers Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00987

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dena Byrd

Defendants

Werner Enterprises, Inc

Hireright

Drivers IQ

Does 1 through 30, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel I Barness

Attorney at Barness and Barness LLP

13636 Ventura Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 91423

Ann A Hull

Attorney at Ann Hull Law Offices Inc

21900 Burbank Boulevard 3Rd Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Jeffrey Marc Schwartz

Attorney at Law Offices of Anna Hull Inc

21900 Burbank Boulevard 3Rd Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorneys

Peter Maretz

Attorney at Stokes Wagner ALC

600 West Broadway Suite 910

San Diego, CA 92101

Yvonne Anda Ricardo

Attorney at Stokes Wagner

600 West Broadway Suite 910

San Diego, CA 92101

Rod M Fliegel

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

333 Bush Street 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 84104

Garrick Y Chan

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

333 Bush Street Suite 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (npo) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Dena Byrd Dena Byrd, (Hull, Ann) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#16

(#16) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ann A Hull counsel for Plaintiff Dena Byrd. Adding Ann A. Hull as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Dena Byrd for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Dena Byrd. (Hull, Ann) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#15

(#15) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ann A Hull counsel for Plaintiff Dena Byrd. Adding Daniel Barness as counsel of record for Dena Byrd for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Dena Byrd. (Hull, Ann) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#14

(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel L Barness counsel for Plaintiff Dena Byrd. Adding Daniel I. Barness as counsel of record for Dena Byrd for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Daniel I. Barness, of counsel. (Barness, Daniel) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#13

(#13) JOINDER filed by Defendant Hireright joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Maretz, Peter) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Hireright.(Fliegel, Rod) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hireright, identifying Corporate Risk Holdings, LLC; HireRight GIS Group Holdings LLC. (Fliegel, Rod) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #9 , Notice of Appearance #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Garrick Y Chan on behalf of Defendant Hireright (Attorney Garrick Y Chan added to party Hireright(pty:dft))(Chan, Garrick) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rod M Fliegel on behalf of Defendant Hireright (Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Hireright(pty:dft))(Fliegel, Rod) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc.(Maretz, Peter) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (npo) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Dena Byrd Dena Byrd, (Hull, Ann) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ann A Hull counsel for Plaintiff Dena Byrd. Adding Ann A. Hull as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Dena Byrd for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Dena Byrd. (Hull, Ann) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ann A Hull counsel for Plaintiff Dena Byrd. Adding Daniel Barness as counsel of record for Dena Byrd for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Dena Byrd. (Hull, Ann) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel L Barness counsel for Plaintiff Dena Byrd. Adding Daniel I. Barness as counsel of record for Dena Byrd for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Daniel I. Barness, of counsel. (Barness, Daniel) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINDER filed by Defendant Hireright joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Maretz, Peter) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Hireright.(Fliegel, Rod) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hireright, identifying Corporate Risk Holdings, LLC; HireRight GIS Group Holdings LLC. (Fliegel, Rod) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #9 , Notice of Appearance #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Garrick Y Chan on behalf of Defendant Hireright (Attorney Garrick Y Chan added to party Hireright(pty:dft))(Chan, Garrick) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rod M Fliegel on behalf of Defendant Hireright (Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Hireright(pty:dft))(Fliegel, Rod) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc.(Maretz, Peter) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Drivers IQ, Hireright, Werner Enterprises, Inc., Does 1 through 30, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Dena Byrd. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/25/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney Werner Enterprises, Inc, identifying Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maretz, Peter) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maretz, Peter) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIV SB 2106666 Receipt No: ACACDC-31453255 - Fee: $402, filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yvonne Ricardo, #2 Declaration) (Attorney Peter Maretz added to party Werner Enterprises, Inc(pty:dft))(Maretz, Peter) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HireRight, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Werner Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garrick Y. Chan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rod M. Fliegel