This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2020 at 09:37:09 (UTC).

Byrd v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Byrd filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Madeline Hughes Haikala. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01447

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Hughes Haikala

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shavonya Byrd

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lieselotte Carmen-Burks

Attorney at WIGGINS, CHILDS, PANTAZIS, FISHER & GOLDFARB, LLC

The Kress Building, 301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Candis A McGowan

Attorney at WIGGINS CHILDS PANTAZIS FISHER & GOLDFARB

The Kress Building, 301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203-3204

Rocco Calamusa, Jr

Attorney at WIGGINS CHILDS PANTAZIS FISHER & GOLDFARB, LLC

301 19Th Street North, The Kress Building

Birmingham, AL 35203-3204

Kameron Monet Buckner

Attorney at WIGGINS, CHILDS, PANTAZIS, FISHER & GOLDFARB, LLC

301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jon C Goldfarb

Attorney at WIGGINS CHILDS PANTAZIS FISHER & GOLDFARB

301 19Th Street North, The Kress Building

Birmingham, AL 35203-3204

Robert L Wiggins, Jr

Attorney at WIGGINS CHILDS QUINN & PANTAZIS LLC

301 North 19Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203-3204

Ann K Wiggins

Attorney at WIGGINS CHILDS PANTAZIS FISHER & GOLDFARB

The Kress Building, 301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203-3204

Defendant Attorneys

Scott A Forman

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON PC

333 Se 2Nd Avenue, Suite 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Stacey T Bradford

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON

420 20Th Street North, Suite 2300

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc (originally filed 2/18/20 in 2:19-cv-2100-MHH). (KEK) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER - For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion (Doc. 49 ), the Court grants Walmart's motion to sever the plaintiffs' claims. (Doc. 5 ). Walmart's motion to dismiss (Doc. 28 ) is denied without prejudice, and Walmart's motion to stay discovery (Doc. 7 ) is moot. The Clerk shall please file the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. 20 ) as the first docket entry in each new civil case. Each plaintiff who would like to pursue her claims on an individual basis shall file an amended complaint in her individual action by October 31, 2020. The parties shall confer and determine the proper venue for each individual action. On or before November 20, 2020, the parties shall please file a joint motion for transfer in each case that an individual plaintiff decides to pursue. The Court sets a videoconference for November 23, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. to discuss any case in which the parties cannot agree on venue. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/28/2020. (originally filed in 2:19-cv-2100-MHH). (KEK) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MEMORANDUM OPINION - For the reasons stated above, by separate order, the Court will grant Walmart's motion to sever the plaintiffs' claims. (Doc. 5 ). The Court will deny Walmart's motion to dismiss (Doc. 28 ) without prejudice, and the Court will find that Walmart's motion to stay discovery (Doc. 7 ) is moot. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/28/2020. (originally filed in 2:19-cv-2100-MHH). (KEK) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kameron Monet Buckner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L Wiggins, Jr