This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:35:53 (UTC).

Ronald Byrd v. Officer Ochoa, et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Ronald Byrd filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Officer Ochoa. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00117

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Byrd

Defendants

Officer Salazar #491

Officer Ochoa #274

DOES 1-10, Jointly and Severally

City of Whittier

Officer Ochoa

Officer Salazar

Does 1 through 10, jointly and severally

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexis Galindo

Attorney at Curd Galindo and Smith LLP

301 East Ocean Boulevard Suite 1700

Long Beach, CA 90802-4828

Maximiliano Alexis Galindo

Attorney at Curd Galindo and Smith LLP

301 East Ocean Boulevard Suite 1700

Long Beach, CA 90802-4828

Defendant Attorneys

James R Touchstone

Attorney at Jones and Mayer

3777 North Harbor Boulevard

Fullerton, CA 92835

Denise L Rocawich

Attorney at Jones and Mayer

3777 North Harbor Boulevard

Fullerton, CA 92835

Melissa Miles Ballard

Attorney at Jones and Mayer

3777 North Harbor Boulevard

Fullerton, CA 92835

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25062251 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd. (Attorney Alexis Galindo added to party Ronald Byrd(pty:pla))(Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants City of Whittier, Salazar.(Attorney Melissa Miles Ballard added to party City of Whittier(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Miles Ballard added to party Salazar(pty:dft))(Ballard, Melissa) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/17/2020. (ake) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd, upon Defendant Salazar served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beckie Ly, Police Services Assistant, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants City of Whittier, Ochoa, Salazar. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd. (Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd, upon Defendant City of Whittier served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paula Uraine, City Clerk Specialist (Authorized to Accept) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of Whittier, Salazar, (Ballard, Melissa) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd. (Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd, (Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/17/2020. (ake) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of Whittier, Salazar, (Ballard, Melissa) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants City of Whittier, Salazar.(Attorney Melissa Miles Ballard added to party City of Whittier(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Miles Ballard added to party Salazar(pty:dft))(Ballard, Melissa) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd, upon Defendant City of Whittier served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paula Uraine, City Clerk Specialist (Authorized to Accept) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd, upon Defendant Salazar served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beckie Ly, Police Services Assistant, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants City of Whittier, Ochoa, Salazar. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd, (Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd. (Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd. (Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25062251 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ronald Byrd. (Attorney Alexis Galindo added to party Ronald Byrd(pty:pla))(Galindo, Alexis) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less