This case was last updated from PACER on 11/12/2019 at 08:39:56 (UTC).

Byrd v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by Byrd against Commissioner of Social Security in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00574

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

Robert H. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Britney Ann Byrd

Picayune, MS 39466

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

SSA General Counsel

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denial of #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 30, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER establishing schedule and requirements for briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 17, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/17/2019) (RLW). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER *RESTRICTED* overruling Plaintiff's Objections #5 , Adopting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation #4 , and Denying Plaintiff's Motion #2 for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on November 6, 2019. (AW) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations filed by Britney Ann Byrd (RLW) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denial of #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 30, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER establishing schedule and requirements for briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 17, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/17/2019) (RLW). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (RLW) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Britney Ann Byrd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Various Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Assignment) (RLW) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less