This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 07:33:23 (UTC).

Byrd et al v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Byrd filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristi K. DuBose, P. Bradley Murray and William E. Cassady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00173

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Judges

Kristi K. DuBose

P. Bradley Murray

William E. Cassady

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scot R. Byrd

Jessica E. Brandon

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc

BP America Production Company

Transocean Deepwater Inc

Transocean Holdings LLC

Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc

Halliburton Energy Services, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Riana Maryanoff

Attorney at Downs Law Group PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Charles David Durkee

Attorney at Downs Law Group PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Miami, FL 33133

Defendant Attorneys

Harlan I. Prater, IV

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

William H. Brooks

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White, L.L.C.

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

Enrique Jose Gimenez

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

Robert Jackson Sewell

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin, & White LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Michael Ryan Dodson

Attorney at Fishman Haygood

201 St. Charles Ave., 46Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Robert Alan York

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#25

(#25) MOTION and APPLICATION for R. Alan York to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3032006, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (York, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#24

(#24) Order re: #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement,, filed by Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc, Transocean Deepwater Inc, Transocean Holdings LLC. It is ORDERED that Defendant Transocean Holdings, LLC shall file, on or before 7/8/2022, a Supplement to the Disclosure Statement identifying the complete citizenship of this limited liability company so this Court may properly assess conflicts/recusal. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/27/2022. (meh) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#23

(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Halliburton Energy Services, Inc, Halliburton Company identifying Corporate Parent Halliburton Company for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (York, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (York, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Brooks, William) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#15

(#24) Order re: #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement,, filed by Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc, Transocean Deepwater Inc, Transocean Holdings LLC. It is ORDERED that Defendant Transocean Holdings, LLC shall file, on or before 7/8/2022, a Supplement to the Disclosure Statement identifying the complete citizenship of this limited liability company so this Court may properly assess conflicts/recusal. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/27/2022. (meh) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates. (Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 05/20/2013.(gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/2/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

3 #7

PTO #68 1st Amended

3 #6

PTO #68

3 #5

PTO #41 2nd Amended

3 #4

PTO #31

3 #3

PTO #25

3 #2

PTO #12 1st Amended

3 #1

PTO #11

3 #3

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by R. Alan York. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/29/22. (lto) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #25 MOTION and APPLICATION for R. Alan York to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. Gen Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (meh) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION and APPLICATION for R. Alan York to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3032006, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (York, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Order re: #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement,, filed by Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc, Transocean Deepwater Inc, Transocean Holdings LLC. It is ORDERED that Defendant Transocean Holdings, LLC shall file, on or before 7/8/2022, a Supplement to the Disclosure Statement identifying the complete citizenship of this limited liability company so this Court may properly assess conflicts/recusal. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/27/2022. (meh) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Halliburton Energy Services, Inc, Halliburton Company identifying Corporate Parent Halliburton Company for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (York, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (York, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Brooks, William) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Enrique Jose Gimenez on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Gimenez, Enrique) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Brooks on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Brooks, William) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 4/25/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/2/2022.] (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement by All Plaintiffs PTO 66 (Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/2/2022.] (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FILED IN ERROR-SEE REC DOC. 9 --Statement by All Plaintiffs PTO 68 (Durkee, Charles) Modified on 2/11/2022 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/2/2022.] (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement by All Plaintiffs PTO 63 (Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/2/2022.] (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to BP America Production Company on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; BP Exploration & Production, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Transocean Deepwater, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Transocean Holdings, LLC on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Waiver of Summons, #2 Summons Waiver of Summons, #3 Summons Waiver of Summons, #4 Summons Waiver of Summons, #5 Summons Waiver of Summons)(Maryanoff, Riana) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/2/2022.] (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR THE B3 BUNDLE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/2/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates. (Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 05/20/2013.(gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/2/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRETRIAL ORDERS #1, #11, #12 1st Amended, #25, #31, #41 2nd Amended, #68, #68 1st Amended. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 PTO #11, #2 PTO #12 1st Amended, #3 PTO #25, #4 PTO #31, #5 PTO #41 2nd Amended, #6 PTO #68, #7 PTO #68 1st Amended)(gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/2/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/2/2022.] (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9106295) filed by Scot R. Byrd, Jessica E. Brandon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Riana Maryanoff added to Scot R. Byrd, Jessica E. Brandon. (pty:pla).(Maryanoff, Riana) Modified text/filer on 11/15/2021 (bw). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/2/2022.] (Entered: 11/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Transocean Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant