This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2022 at 07:18:33 (UTC).

Byrd et al v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2021 Byrd filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02104

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scot R. Byrd

Jessica E. Brandon

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production, Inc.

BP America Production Company

Transocean Deepwater, Inc.

Transocean Holdings, LLC

Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.

Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Riana Maryanoff

Attorney at Downs Law Group, PA

3250 Mary Streetsuite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Charles David Durkee

Attorney at Downs Law Group, PA

3250 Mary Streetsuite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

 

Court Documents

6 #5

Summons Waiver of Summons

6 #4

Summons Waiver of Summons

6 #3

Summons Waiver of Summons

6 #2

Summons Waiver of Summons

6 #1

Summons Waiver of Summons

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to BP America Production Company on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; BP Exploration & Production, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Transocean Deepwater, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Transocean Holdings, LLC on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Waiver of Summons, #2 Summons Waiver of Summons, #3 Summons Waiver of Summons, #4 Summons Waiver of Summons, #5 Summons Waiver of Summons)(Maryanoff, Riana) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#5

(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR THE B3 BUNDLE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(gec) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates. (Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 05/20/2013.(gec) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

3 #7

PTO #68 1st Amended

3 #6

PTO #68

3 #5

PTO #41 2nd Amended

3 #4

PTO #31

3 #3

PTO #25

3 #2

PTO #12 1st Amended

3 #1

PTO #11

#3

(#3) PRETRIAL ORDERS #1, #11, #12 1st Amended, #25, #31, #41 2nd Amended, #68, #68 1st Amended. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 PTO #11, #2 PTO #12 1st Amended, #3 PTO #25, #4 PTO #31, #5 PTO #41 2nd Amended, #6 PTO #68, #7 PTO #68 1st Amended)(gec) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to BP America Production Company on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; BP Exploration & Production, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Transocean Deepwater, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Transocean Holdings, LLC on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022; Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Waiver of Summons, #2 Summons Waiver of Summons, #3 Summons Waiver of Summons, #4 Summons Waiver of Summons, #5 Summons Waiver of Summons)(Maryanoff, Riana) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR THE B3 BUNDLE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(gec) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates. (Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 05/20/2013.(gec) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRETRIAL ORDERS #1, #11, #12 1st Amended, #25, #31, #41 2nd Amended, #68, #68 1st Amended. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 PTO #11, #2 PTO #12 1st Amended, #3 PTO #25, #4 PTO #31, #5 PTO #41 2nd Amended, #6 PTO #68, #7 PTO #68 1st Amended)(gec) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9106295) filed by Scot R. Byrd, Jessica E. Brandon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Riana Maryanoff added to Scot R. Byrd, Jessica E. Brandon. (pty:pla).(Maryanoff, Riana) Modified text/filer on 11/15/2021 (bw). (Entered: 11/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant