This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 07:55:56 (UTC).

Bynum v. County of Northampton et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Bynum filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against County of Northampton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CT-03322

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Olander R. Bynum

Tillery, NC 27887

Defendants

Sergeant Tim K. Spence

County of Northampton

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Olander R. Bynum. (Attachment: #1 Document in Support) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#5

(#5) CORRECTED COMPLAINT (on the form) against Tim K. Spence filed by Olander R. Bynum. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

5 #1

Cover Letter

#4

(#4) ORDER - Response to order due by 12/23/2019. In the event plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the clerk shall, without further order of the court, dismiss this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/9/2019. Copy served via US Mail, along with civil rights package: Olander R. Bynum 0060459, Caledonia Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 137, Tillery, NC 27887. (Castania, M) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

5 #2

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against County of Northampton and Tim K. Spence filed by Olander R. Bynum. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#7

(#7) Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 12/30/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#8

(#8) TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Olander R. Bynum at Caledonia Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF DEFICIENCY - Response to order due by 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 11/5/2019. Copy served via US Mail, along with forms, on plaintiff at Caledonia Correctional. (Castania, M) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

1 #1

Documents in Support

6 #1

Document in Support

1 #2

Envelope

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 12/30/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Olander R. Bynum. (Attachment: #1 Document in Support) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORRECTED COMPLAINT (on the form) against Tim K. Spence filed by Olander R. Bynum. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER - Response to order due by 12/23/2019. In the event plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the clerk shall, without further order of the court, dismiss this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/9/2019. Copy served via US Mail, along with civil rights package: Olander R. Bynum 0060459, Caledonia Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 137, Tillery, NC 27887. (Castania, M) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER OF DEFICIENCY - Response to order due by 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 11/5/2019. Copy served via US Mail, along with forms, on plaintiff at Caledonia Correctional. (Castania, M) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Olander R. Bynum at Caledonia Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against County of Northampton and Tim K. Spence filed by Olander R. Bynum. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less