This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:02:53 (UTC).

Byler v Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Byler filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Knepp, II and Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01822

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James R. Knepp, II

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taunya Byler

Defendant

Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rebecca R. Gillissie

Attorney at Wilson & Gillissie

1382 West Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorneys

Ruchi Vikram Asher

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland - Social Security

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Social Security Administration - Chicago

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/18/2020. (S,JM) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Commissioner of the Social Security Administration on 8/20/2020 c/o U.S. Attorney, unsigned, marked C-19; Regional Chief Counsel, unsigned, marked C-19; U.S. Attorney General. Filed on behalf of Taunya Byler. Related document(s) #5 . (R,Ke) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of the U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,JM) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/18/2020. (S,JM) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketAutomatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 08/17/2020. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketJudge Solomon Oliver, Jr. assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Taunya Byler. (Gillissie, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Taunya Byler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for the US Attorney General, #3 Summons for the US Attorney for the ND of Ohio, #4 Summons for the Social Security Administration, #5 USM-285 for the US Attorney General, #6 USM-285 for the US Attorney for the ND of Ohio, #7 USM-285 for the Social Security Administration) (Gillissie, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less