This case was last updated from PACER on 06/30/2020 at 09:13:45 (UTC).

Buttram v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 Buttram filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Walter E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00101

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Walter E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marilyn Buttram

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lisa Smith Siegel

Attorney at Office of Lisa S. Siegel

Suite 200, 5555 Glenridge Connector

Atlanta, GA 30342

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) SECOND AMENDED ORDER re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/1/2020. (dob) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by Marilyn Buttram. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 5/7/2020, answer due 8/15/2020. (Siegel, Lisa) Modified on 5/7/2020 to edit date of service (dob). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SECOND AMENDED ORDER re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/1/2020. (dob) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: #3 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 4:20-cv-101-WEJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (dob) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Office of the Regional Counsel. (dob) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Marilyn Buttram. (dob) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC9651366) filed by Marilyn Buttram. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less