This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2023 at 08:06:06 (UTC).

BUTTO v. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 BUTTO filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AMAZON COM SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Leda D. Wettre and John Michael Vazquez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

Presiding Judge

John Michael Vazquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RONALD BUTTO

Defendants

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC

JONATHAN (last name unknown)

JESSICA (last name unknown)

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5 (fictitious names describing presently unidentified business entities)

JOHN DOES 1-5 (fictitious names describing presently unidentified individuals)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER D. VALENZANO

Defendant Attorneys

KEITH J. ROSENBLATT

MARLIE P. BLAISE

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC from Superior Court of NJ, Law Division, Hudson Cty, case number HUD-L-003942-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13933621), filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

1 #1

Supplement Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC identifying Amazon.com Services LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#3

(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE REPLY PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 6.1(b). Attorney KEITH J. ROSENBLATT for AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC added. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROSENBLATT on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MARLIE P. BLAISE on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#6

(#6) Letter from Attorney Valenzano re #1 Notice of Removal,. (VALENZANO, PETER) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#7

(#7) Letter from Keith J. Rosenblatt, Esq. re #6 Letter. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#9

(#9) Letter from Keith J. Rosenblatt, Esq. re Status Conference. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER remanding this matter to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 1/23/2023. (lag, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#11

(#11) Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Hudson County Administration Building595 Newark AvenueJersey City, NJ 07306 State No: HUD-L-003942-22. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (lag, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Hudson County Administration Building595 Newark AvenueJersey City, NJ 07306 State No: HUD-L-003942-22. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (lag, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER remanding this matter to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 1/23/2023. (lag, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from Keith J. Rosenblatt, Esq. re Status Conference. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 1/17/2023. (LM, ) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER - A telephone conference is set for January 17, 2023 at 4:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/11/2023. (rn) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter from Keith J. Rosenblatt, Esq. re #6 Letter. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Attorney Valenzano re #1 Notice of Removal,. (VALENZANO, PETER) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/25/2023. (lag, ) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, ) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MARLIE P. BLAISE on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROSENBLATT on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE REPLY PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 6.1(b). Attorney KEITH J. ROSENBLATT for AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC added. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC identifying Amazon.com Services LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC from Superior Court of NJ, Law Division, Hudson Cty, case number HUD-L-003942-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13933621), filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less