This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2020 at 10:50:37 (UTC).

Buttler v. City of Sperry et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Buttler filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Sperry. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory K Frizzell and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00355

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory K Frizzell

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Ray Buttler

Defendants

City of Sperry

John Carr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura L Hamilton

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Donald Eugene Smolen, II

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

John William Warren

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorney

Scott Boudinot Wood

Attorney at Wood Puhl & Wood

2409 E Skelly Dr Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74105

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by John Carr [Note: Attorney Scott Boudinot Wood added to party John Carr(pty:dft).] (Wood, Scott) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: John Carr (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by City of Sperry [Note: Attorney Scott Boudinot Wood added to party City of Sperry(pty:dft).] (Wood, Scott) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: City of Sperry (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to John Carr, City of Sperry (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Carr, City of Sperry (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2237375) by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by John Carr [Note: Attorney Scott Boudinot Wood added to party John Carr(pty:dft).] (Wood, Scott) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: John Carr (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by City of Sperry [Note: Attorney Scott Boudinot Wood added to party City of Sperry(pty:dft).] (Wood, Scott) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: City of Sperry (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to John Carr, City of Sperry (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Carr, City of Sperry (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2237375) by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John William Warren

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura L Hamilton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald Eugene Smolen, II