This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2021 at 02:55:04 (UTC).

Buttels v. Dollar Tree Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Buttels filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dollar Tree Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00199

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gil Buttels

Defendants

Storage Solutions Inc

Family Dollar Trucking Inc

Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc

Dollar Tree Inc

Dollar Tree Distribution Inc

Dollar Tree Stores Inc

Family Dollar Stores Inc

Family Dollar Services LLC

Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC

Family Dollar Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashley Jordan Davis

Attorney at Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC

4801 North Hills Boulevard, Suite 1550

North Little Rock, AR 72116

John Paul Byrd

Attorney at Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC

415 North Mckinley Street, Suite 210

Little Rock, AR 72205

Richard I. Levin

Attorney at Levin, Riback and Adelman, P.C.

10 North Dearborn Street, 11Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Adam B. Riback

Attorney at Levin, Riback and Adelman, P.C.

10 North Dearborn Street, 11Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Maryann Furrer

Attorney at Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC

415 North Mckinley Street, Suite 210

Little Rock, AR 72205

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Steven Breeding

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.

Regions Center, Suite 1900, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

Ronald L. Harper

Attorney at Leitner, Williams, Dooley & Napolitan, PLLC

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38120

Nelson Tyler Rainey

Attorney at Leitner, Williams, Dooley & Napolitan, PLLC

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38120

 

Court Documents

39 #1

Proposed Final Scheduling Order

#39

(#39) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/12/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/26/2021. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 3/7/2022 at 9:15 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge James M. Moody Jr.Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#38

(#38) ORDER denying as premature #21 Defendants' motion to dismiss. The best course of action is to proceed with discovery and to address the issue by amended pleading or on summary judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/19/2021. (ljb) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#37

(#37) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Family Dollar Trucking Inc by Dollar Tree Stores Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC, Family Dollar Stores Inc, Family Dollar Services Inc, Family Dollar Trucking Inc, Family Dollar Services LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc, Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Harper, Ronald) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#36

(#36) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc by Dollar Tree Stores Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC, Family Dollar Stores Inc, Family Dollar Services Inc, Family Dollar Trucking Inc, Family Dollar Services LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc, Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Harper, Ronald) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#35

(#35) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Family Dollar Services Inc by Dollar Tree Stores Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC, Family Dollar Stores Inc, Family Dollar Services Inc, Family Dollar Trucking Inc, Family Dollar Services LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc, Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Harper, Ronald) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Maryann Furrer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Furrer, Maryann) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#33

(#33) RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gil Buttels. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#21

(#33) RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gil Buttels. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#8

(#10) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error based on the attached correspondence. (kbc) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Trucking Inc served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Services Inc served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Services LLC served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Dollar Tree Stores Inc served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AT LAW with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Gil Buttels. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT079293.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/12/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/26/2021. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 3/7/2022 at 9:15 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge James M. Moody Jr.Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER denying as premature #21 Defendants' motion to dismiss. The best course of action is to proceed with discovery and to address the issue by amended pleading or on summary judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/19/2021. (ljb) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Family Dollar Trucking Inc by Dollar Tree Stores Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC, Family Dollar Stores Inc, Family Dollar Services Inc, Family Dollar Trucking Inc, Family Dollar Services LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc, Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Harper, Ronald) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc by Dollar Tree Stores Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC, Family Dollar Stores Inc, Family Dollar Services Inc, Family Dollar Trucking Inc, Family Dollar Services LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc, Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Harper, Ronald) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Family Dollar Services Inc by Dollar Tree Stores Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC, Family Dollar Stores Inc, Family Dollar Services Inc, Family Dollar Trucking Inc, Family Dollar Services LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc, Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Harper, Ronald) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Maryann Furrer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Furrer, Maryann) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gil Buttels. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to File. The court will consider Plaintiff's supplemental pleading. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/30/2020. (amr) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc served on 12/8/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Services Inc served on 12/8/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error based on the attached correspondence. (kbc) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service. Family Dollar Stores Inc. served on 10/26/2020 filed by Gil Buttels. (Davis, Ashley) (Docket text modified on 10/28/2020 to indicate the party served) (jak) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (wrong image file). (Davis, Ashley) Docket text modified on 10/27/2020 to indicate the document as filed in error. (kbc) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Trucking Inc served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Services Inc served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Family Dollar Services LLC served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice , filed by Gil Buttels. Dollar Tree Stores Inc served on 10/20/2020. (Davis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AT LAW with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Gil Buttels. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT079293.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Storage Solutions Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FAMILY DOLLAR SERVICES, LLC is a litigant