This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:26:35 (UTC).

BUTT v. MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BUTT filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Hammer and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-21086

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABID BUTT

ABID B. BUTT

Defendants

MENA ROMAN

MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE

Attorney at Criscione Ravala, LLP

2001 Route 46, Suite 310

Parsippany, NJ 07054

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC, MENA ROMAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Summons to be Issued by ABID BUTT as to MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC. (CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on MGR ENT LLC on 12/12/2019, filed by ABID B. BUTT. (CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC, MENA ROMAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10159072) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ABID BUTT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ABID B. BUTT (CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mena Roman on 12/12/2019, filed by ABID B. BUTT. (CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER of Voluntary DISMISSAL re #7 Notice. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/17/2020. (dam, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by ABID BUTT as to MENA ROMAN. (CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER of Voluntary DISMISSAL re #7 Notice. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/17/2020. (dam, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ABID B. BUTT (CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on MGR ENT LLC on 12/12/2019, filed by ABID B. BUTT. (CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mena Roman on 12/12/2019, filed by ABID B. BUTT. (CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC, MENA ROMAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Summons to be Issued by ABID BUTT as to MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC. (CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by ABID BUTT as to MENA ROMAN. (CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC, MENA ROMAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10159072) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ABID BUTT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CRISCIONE, GALEN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.