This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/28/2020 at 09:12:36 (UTC).

Butler v. Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Butler filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lynn Adelman and Brett Ludwig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01172

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lynn Adelman

Brett Ludwig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dr. Jesse Butler

Defendant

Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan R Graff

Attorney at Mayer Graff & Wallace LLP

1425 Memorial Drive, Suite B

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Joshua Greatsinger

Attorney at Mayer Graff & Wallace LLP

1425 Memorial Drive, Suite B

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew S Ponzi

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi and Rudloff PC

222 N Lasalle St - Ste 1400

Chicago, IL 60601

Brian E Devilling

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi and Rudloff PC

222 N Lasalle St - Ste 1400

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company - Waiver sent on 8/7/2020. (Graff, Ryan)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company filed by Jesse Butler.(Graff, Ryan)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E Devilling on behalf of Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian E. Devilling (Devilling, Brian)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S Ponzi on behalf of Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew S. Ponzi (Ponzi, Matthew)

#3

(#3) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/17/20. Plaintiff is directed to file a statement in support of jurisdiction, identifying the state in which Defendant is incorporated, on or before August 28, 2020. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Greatsinger on behalf of Jesse Butler. Attorney(s) appearing: Joshua M. Greatsinger (Greatsinger, Joshua)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company by Jesse Butler. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3526027) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Graff, Ryan)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketThis case has been reassigned to newly appointed Judge Brett Ludwig. (kmm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company - Waiver sent on 8/7/2020. (Graff, Ryan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Ponzi, Matthew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE from the clerk to Defendant's Counsel requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company filed by Jesse Butler.(Graff, Ryan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E Devilling on behalf of Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian E. Devilling (Devilling, Brian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S Ponzi on behalf of Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew S. Ponzi (Ponzi, Matthew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/17/20. Plaintiff is directed to file a statement in support of jurisdiction, identifying the state in which Defendant is incorporated, on or before August 28, 2020. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Greatsinger on behalf of Jesse Butler. Attorney(s) appearing: Joshua M. Greatsinger (Greatsinger, Joshua)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint filed by Jesse Butler ; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified (do not add addresses or punctuation) - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (bx)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company by Jesse Butler. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3526027) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Graff, Ryan)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Greatsinger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan R Graff