This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:01:11 (UTC).

BUTLER v. ADKINS et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 BUTLER filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against ADKINS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER and THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00221

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

Referral Judge

THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER

Macon, GA 31208

Defendants

RAY FOLSOM

JAMI LEWIS

Willie Hudson

REMELL BUTLER

SHEILA ADKINS

CHARLOTTE BUNN

ROBERT BRICE

W E BOZEMAN

JOHN AND OR JANE DOE

QUANTERRIOUS GARDNER

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint against All Defendants by DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 12/23/2019 (TQL) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee. Filed by DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#7

(#7) Letter from Clerk of Court to Darryl P. Butler re #4 Order. (mdm) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (mdm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#5

(#5) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER. (mdm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER from 1:19-CV-63 DIRECTING CLERK to open a new case for the claims against Defendants Adkins, Folsom, Lewis, Brice, Bozeman, Hudson, Bunn, Gardner, Butler, and John and/or Jane Doe. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/04/2019. (mdm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

3 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) AMENDED #1 Complaint against All Defendants by DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint against All Defendants by DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER ***Pages 18, 19 & 20*** (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER ***Pages 18-20 of the handwritten document are missing.*** (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm) Modified on 12/4/2019 (mdm). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint against All Defendants by DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFiling fee Paid: Initial Filing Fee $400.00; Receipt #42386. (mdm) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 12/23/2019 (TQL) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee. Filed by DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter from Clerk of Court to Darryl P. Butler re #4 Order. (mdm) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (mdm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER. (mdm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER from 1:19-CV-63 DIRECTING CLERK to open a new case for the claims against Defendants Adkins, Folsom, Lewis, Brice, Bozeman, Hudson, Bunn, Gardner, Butler, and John and/or Jane Doe. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/04/2019. (mdm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED #1 Complaint against All Defendants by DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint against All Defendants by DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER ***Pages 18, 19 & 20*** (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by DARRYL PERNELL BUTLER ***Pages 18-20 of the handwritten document are missing.*** (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm) Modified on 12/4/2019 (mdm). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less