This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2021 at 10:54:46 (UTC).

Butler-Smith v. Hyundai Motor Manufacturing Alabama

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 Butler-Smith filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Hyundai Motor Manufacturing Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Russ Walker, William Keith Watkins and Jerusha T. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00598

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerusha T. Adams

Presiding Judges

Susan Russ Walker

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Demitria Butler-Smith

Defendants

Hyundai Motor Manufacture Alabama

Hyundai Motor Manufacturing Alabama

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.

Attorney at McPhillips Shinbaum, L.L.P.

P O Box 64

Montgomery, AL 36101

Kyle David Sawyer

Attorney at K. David Sawyer - Atty at Law

516 S Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

David James Middlebrooks

Attorney at Lehr Middlebrooks Vreeland & Thompson PC

Po Box 11945

Birmingham, AL 35202-1945

Whitney Ryan Brown

Attorney at Lehr Middlebrooks Price & Vreeland, PC

2021 Third Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER: Briefing deadlines and instructions for all pending and future motions. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/25/2021. (cwl, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#11

(#11) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: on-the-record Final Pretrial Conference set before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins for 1/26/2023, in the FMJ U.S. Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; Jury Trial set before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins for 3/27/2023, in Montgomery, AL; Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2021; Discovery due by 8/25/2022; dispositive & daubert Motions due by 9/26/2022; Mediation Notice due by 8/30/2022, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/22/2021. (furn: calendar, wr)(cwl, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Middlebrooks, David) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#9

(#9) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/21/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/30/2021. (hfc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Motor Manufacture Alabama. (Middlebrooks, David) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hyundai Motor Manufacture Alabama.(Middlebrooks, David) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#6

(#6) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Demitria Butler-Smith re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Sawyer, Kyle) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motor Manufacture Alabama; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

3 #1

Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Demitria Butler-Smith. (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

1 #3

receipt

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER: Briefing deadlines and instructions for all pending and future motions. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/25/2021. (cwl, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: on-the-record Final Pretrial Conference set before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins for 1/26/2023, in the FMJ U.S. Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; Jury Trial set before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins for 3/27/2023, in Montgomery, AL; Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2021; Discovery due by 8/25/2022; dispositive & daubert Motions due by 9/26/2022; Mediation Notice due by 8/30/2022, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/22/2021. (furn: calendar, wr)(cwl, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Middlebrooks, David) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/21/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/30/2021. (hfc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PURSUANT TO THE #7 ANSWER - Attorney Whitney Ryan Brown for Hyundai Motor Manufacture Alabama added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Motor Manufacture Alabama. (Middlebrooks, David) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hyundai Motor Manufacture Alabama.(Middlebrooks, David) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Demitria Butler-Smith re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Sawyer, Kyle) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motor Manufacture Alabama; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Demitria Butler-Smith. Corporate Disclosures due by 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Demitria Butler-Smith. (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Demitria Butler-Smith. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hyundai Motor Manufacture Alabama ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064609.), filed by Demitria Butler-Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 receipt)(cwl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR MANUFACTURING ALABAMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whitney Ryan Brown

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David James Middlebrooks