This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2023 at 08:42:43 (UTC).

Butler-Neebee v. United States Citizenship & Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 Butler-Neebee filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against United States Citizenship Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lori Ann Butler-Neebee

Defendants

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

United States Customs and Border Protection

United States Department of Justice

United States Attorney General

Board of Immigration Appeals

Department of State

David L. Neal

Richard C. Visek

Jonathan E. Meyer

Jonathan Crawford

Duane A Evans

A. Ashley Tabaddor

Jeffrey Martin Landry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Christopher J. Rouse

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Jeffrey Martin Landry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christopher J. Rouse added to party Jeffrey Martin Landry(pty:dft).(Rouse, Christopher) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

1 #18

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #17

Summons

1 #15

Summons

1 #14

Summons

1 #13

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Summons

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Jeffrey Martin Landry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christopher J. Rouse added to party Jeffrey Martin Landry(pty:dft).(Rouse, Christopher) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Board of Immigration Appeals, Jeffrey Martin Landry. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ss) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Board of Immigration Appeals, Jonathan Crawford, Department of State, Duane A Evans, Ur M. Jaddou, Jeffrey Martin Landry, Jonathan E. Meyer, David L. Neal, A. Ashley Tabaddor, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney General, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Justice, Richard C. Visek. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(ss) QC'd on 2/15/2023 (aj). (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lori Ann Butler-Neebee. (Filing fee $ 402.00 RECEIPT NO. LAE076243). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(ss) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less