This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2022 at 11:37:30 (UTC).

Busy v. American Modern Home Insurance Co et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 Busy filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Modern Home Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Kayla D McClusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-05117

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Kayla D McClusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Busy

Defendants

American Modern Home Insurance Co

American Modern Property & Casualty Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

R William Huye, III

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Assoc (NO)

1820 St Charles Ave Ste 110

New Orleans, LA 70130

Cameron Sean Snowden

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Assoc (HOU)

1415 Louisiana St Ste 2900

Houston, TX 77002

Claude Favrot Reynaud, III

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Assoc (NO)

1820 St Charles Ave Ste 110

New Orleans, LA 70130

Grant P Gardiner

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Assoc (NO)

1820 St Charles Ave Ste 110

New Orleans, LA 70130

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER staying cases filed by the McClenny, Moseley, and Associates Firm until further order of this Court. See PDF of order for more information. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 10/21/2022. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Modern Home Insurance Co, American Modern Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER staying cases filed by the McClenny, Moseley, and Associates Firm until further order of this Court. See PDF of order for more information. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 10/21/2022. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Modern Home Insurance Co, American Modern Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Modern Home Insurance Co, American Modern Property & Casualty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5245812) filed by Robin Busy. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney R William Huye, III added to party Robin Busy(pty:pla))(aty,Huye, R) Modified docket text on 9/16/2022 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MODERN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where American Modern Home Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cade Richard Cole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick A Juneau, Jr