This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2020 at 08:56:15 (UTC).

Bustillos v. The City of Artesia et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Bustillos filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The City of Artesia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephan M. Vidmar, Gregory J. Fouratt and Judith C. Herrera. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01060

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

Presiding Judges

Stephan M. Vidmar

Judith C. Herrera

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albert Bustillos

Defendants

The City of Artesia

David Bailey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam C. Flores

Attorney at Kennedy, Kennedy & Ives

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Joseph P. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

K. Renee Gantert

Attorney at Atwood Malone Turner & Sabin, PA

P.O. Drawer 700

Roswell, NM 88202-0700

Bryan D Evans

Attorney at Atwood, Malone, Turner & Sabin, PA

Po Drawer 700

Roswell, NM 88202-0700

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic pre-settlement status conference set for 3/3/2021, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Settlement Conference set for 3/17/2021 at 10:00 AM. The Court will decide later whether to conduct the settlement conference via Zoom video conference or to hold it in person at a United States courthouse in this District. (nmh) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due by 6/3/2021. Pretrial Motions due by 7/1/2021. (nmh) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#13

(#13) Clerk's Minutes for Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt on 12/9/2020. (nmh) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albert Bustillos Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Statement (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The City of Artesia for Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Evans, Bryan) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#10

(#10) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by The City of Artesia (Evans, Bryan) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by November 12, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#6

(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 12/9/2020 at 03:00 PM. Parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/12/2020. (gbg) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Violations of Civil Rights by The City of Artesia. (Evans, Bryan) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet to Def. Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A to Def. Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fifth Judicial District, County of Eddy, case number D-503-CV-2020-00631. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Def. Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet to Def. Notice of Removal)(Evans, Bryan) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic pre-settlement status conference set for 3/3/2021, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Settlement Conference set for 3/17/2021 at 10:00 AM. The Court will decide later whether to conduct the settlement conference via Zoom video conference or to hold it in person at a United States courthouse in this District. (nmh) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due by 6/3/2021. Pretrial Motions due by 7/1/2021. (nmh) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Clerk's Minutes for Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt on 12/9/2020. (nmh) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albert Bustillos Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Statement (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The City of Artesia for Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Evans, Bryan) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by The City of Artesia (Evans, Bryan) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos: 4 and 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#8) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by November 12, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 12/9/2020 at 03:00 PM. Parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/12/2020. (gbg) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Violations of Civil Rights by The City of Artesia. (Evans, Bryan) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (arp) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7356158 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by David Bailey, City of Artesia (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Evans, Bryan) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fifth Judicial District, County of Eddy, case number D-503-CV-2020-00631. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Def. Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet to Def. Notice of Removal)(Evans, Bryan) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam C. Flores

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Kennedy