This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2021 at 09:31:49 (UTC).

Bustillos v. Randall-Reilly LLC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Bustillos filed an Other lawsuit against Randall-Reilly LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is L Scott Coogler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00900

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

L Scott Coogler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joanne Bustillos

Defendant

Randall-Reilly LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Richard Cox

Attorney at JOHN R COX PLLC

9786-A Timber Circle

Spanish Fort, AL 36527

Ignacio J Hiraldo

Attorney at IJH LAW

1200 Brickell Ave Suite 1950

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

James Ethan McDaniel

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

1901 6Th Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

John David Collins

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

1901 6Th Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203-2618

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#6

#7

#8

#11

11 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 08/20/21.(RWS) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Randall-Reilly LLC. (McDaniel, James) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 07/28/2021. (LSB) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3891867. (Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joanne Bustillos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 07/27/2021. (LSB) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The required fee has not been paid. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 07/27/2021. (LSB) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/22/2021. (PSM) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Randall-Reilly LLC. filed by Randall-Reilly LLC (McDaniel, James) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Randall-Reilly LLC. (McDaniel, James) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joanne Bustillos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joanne Bustillos. Randall-Reilly LLC served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Randall-Reilly LLC. (PSM) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3875652 (B4601114364). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Randall-Reilly LLC, filed by Joanne Bustillos.(PSM). (Cox, John) Modified on 7/2/2021 (MEB2). (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Joanne Bustillos. (Cox, John) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Randall-Reilly LLC, filed by Joanne Bustillos.(PSM) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James E. McDaniel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John David Collins