This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 13:14:40 (UTC).

Bush v. Wilmington Police Department

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Bush filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wilmington Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00108

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alex Bush

Wilmington, DE 19802

Defendant

Wilmington Police Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Caitlyn E. Quinn

Attorney at City of Wilmington Law Department

Louis L. Redding City/County Building, 800 N. French Street, 9Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801-3537

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ANSWERING BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Alex Bush. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/19/2020. (kmd) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

7 #1

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) MOTION requesting submission of video and demand for jury trial - filed by Alex Bush. (amf) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N19C-12-084 JRJ (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2833688)- filed by Wilmington Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wilmington Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Caitlyn) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#4

(#4) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wilmington Police Department.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/12/2020. (Quinn, Caitlyn) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Wilmington Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Caitlyn) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

3 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

Exhibit A-B

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wilmington Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Caitlyn) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWERING BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Alex Bush. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/19/2020. (kmd) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION requesting submission of video and demand for jury trial - filed by Alex Bush. (amf) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wilmington Police Department.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/12/2020. (Quinn, Caitlyn) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Wilmington Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Caitlyn) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Remark: Mailed docket sheet to Plaintiff. (mal) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N19C-12-084 JRJ (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2833688)- filed by Wilmington Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.