This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 20:48:33 (UTC).

Bush et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Bush filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Stan Baker and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00219

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Stan Baker

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

R. Mitchell Bush

R.M. Bush & Company doing business as The Bush Agency

Defendant

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harry D. Dixon, Jr.

Attorney at Donnie Dixon Attorney at Law

7 E Congress Streetsuite 400

Savannah, GA 31401

William P. Tedards, Jr.

1101 30Th Street, N.W.Suite 500

Washington, DC 20007

Thomas Geoghegan

Attorney at Despres, Schwartz, & Geoghegan, Ltd.

77 W. Washington St.Suite 711

Chicago, IL 30302

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth P. Kessler

Attorney at Jones Day

325 John H. Mcconnell Blvd.Suite 600

Columbus, OH 43215

Wade Wilkes Herring, II

Attorney at Hunter Maclean, Exley & Dunn, P.C.

200 E. Saint Julian Streetp.O. Box 9848

Savannah, GA 31412-0048

Quintin F. Lindsmith

Attorney at Bricker & Eckler LLP

100 South Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Ali I. Haque

Attorney at Bricker & Eckler, LLP

100 South Third St.

Columbus, GA 43215

Shawn A. Kachmar

Attorney at HunterMaclean, PC

P.O. Box 9848

Savannah, GA 31412-0048

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) STATUS REPORT SECOND JOINT REPORT PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER (Doc. 38) by R. Mitchell Bush, R.M. Bush & Company. (Dixon, Harry) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#42

(#42) STATUS REPORT INITIAL JOINT by R. Mitchell Bush, R.M. Bush & Company. (Dixon, Harry) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

41 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

41 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

41 #41

Main Document

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn A. Kachmar on behalf of All Defendants (Kachmar, Shawn) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

39 #1

Text of Proposed Order

39 #39

Main Document

#16

#5

#4

#2

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibi 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/28/2022. (JH) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) STATUS REPORT SECOND JOINT REPORT PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER (Doc. 38) by R. Mitchell Bush, R.M. Bush & Company. (Dixon, Harry) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) STATUS REPORT INITIAL JOINT by R. Mitchell Bush, R.M. Bush & Company. (Dixon, Harry) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Wade W. Herring, II by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Herring, Wade) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn A. Kachmar on behalf of All Defendants (Kachmar, Shawn) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Status Report from 10/19/2021 to 10/29/2021, by R. Mitchell Bush, R.M. Bush & Company. Responses due by 10/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dixon, Harry) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #16 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint. The Court orders the parties to submit the underlying dispute to arbitration and directs the Clerk to stay and administratively close this case. The parties are directed to file a joint status report on the status of arbitration sixty days from the date of this order and every sixty days thereafter. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 08/20/2021. (jlh) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) RESPONSE to #36 Second MOTION to Stay Discovery and Federal Civil Rule 26 Obligations and Requirements filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company filed by R. Mitchell Bush, R.M. Bush & Company. (Dixon, Harry) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #36 Second MOTION to Stay Discovery and Federal Civil Rule 26 Obligations and Requirements. (slt) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Second MOTION to Stay Discovery and Federal Civil Rule 26 Obligations and Requirements by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery)(Haque, Ali) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth P. Kessler. (JH) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth P. Kessler Receipt Number AGASDC-2932197, Fee Amount $200, by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Admission)(Herring, Wade) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting re #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/16/2020. (loh) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William P, Tedards, Jr. (JH) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William P, Tedards, Jr. Receipt Number AGASDC-2923586, Fee Amount $200, by R.M. Bush & Company. Responses due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supplement LR 83.4(b)(2) certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dixon, Harry) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/14/20. (wwp) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400, receipt number AFASDC 2922986. (wwp) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (wwp) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, filed by R. Mitchell Bush, R.M. Bush & Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibi 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(wwp) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wade Wilkes Herring, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn A. Kachmar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quintin F. Lindsmith Esq.