This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2019 at 07:31:43 (UTC).

Busey v. Wells Fargo Bank NA

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 Busey filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Bryan and Brian A Tsuchida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05880

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Bryan

Referral Judge

Brian A Tsuchida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Busey

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart Charles Morgan

Attorney at LEDGER SQUARE LAW PS

71O Market St

Tacoma, WA 98402

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan J. Case

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP (SEATTLE)

1001 Fourth Avenue, Suite 4500

Seattle, WA 98154

Al Roundtree

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP (SEATTLE)

1001 Fourth Avenue, Suite 4500

Seattle, WA 98154

Wendy E Lyon

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP (SEATTLE)

1001 Fourth Avenue, Suite 4500

Seattle, WA 98154

Seth B Burack

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP (FL)

777 South Flagler Dr Ste 1700, West Tower

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint; by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Roundtree, Al) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

17 #2

Exhibit B

17 #1

Exhibit A

#17

(#17) DECLARATION of Al Roundtree filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Roundtree, Al) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

16 #2

Exhibit B

16 #1

Exhibit A

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/18/2019, (Roundtree, Al) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B - Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 19-2-10470-3; (Receipt # 0981-5933432), filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roundtree, Al) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to Complaint; by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Roundtree, Al) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DECLARATION of Al Roundtree filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Roundtree, Al) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Roundtree, Al) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Stuart Charles Morgan for Plaintiff James Busey from 10/18-20/19, 11/8/19, 11/15-17/19, 12/21/19-1/5/20. (Morgan, Stuart) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DECLARATION of Stuart C. Morgan filed by Plaintiff James Busey re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Morgan, Stuart) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff James Busey, to #11 MOTION to Dismiss . (Morgan, Stuart) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRING #11 MOTION to Dismiss to: Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DECLARATION of Al Roundtree filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Roundtree, Al) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/18/2019, (Roundtree, Al) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan Case and referred to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (TF) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Bryan J. Case and Wendy E Lyon for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Case, Bryan) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Seth B Burack for Wells Fargo Bank NA, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Seth B. Burack by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. 0981-5938823 (Roundtree, Al) Modified on 9/24/2019 correct title of document (CDA). (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/27/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (ERA) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Roundtree, Al) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 19-2-10470-3; (Receipt # 0981-5933432), filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roundtree, Al) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less