This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 08:31:34 (UTC).

Busby v. Avondale Industries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Busby filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Avondale Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00104

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Marie Busby

3Rd Party Plaintiffs, Cross Claimants and Defendants

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

McCarty Corporation

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Eagle Inc.

International Paper Company

CBS Corporation

Hopeman Brothers Inc.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing Company

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

General Electric Company

Zurich American Insurance Company

Lamorak Insurance Company

Onebeacon Insurance Company

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Avondale Industries, Inc.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Eagle Inc.

International Paper Company

CBS Corporation

Hopeman Brothers Inc.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing Company

General Electric Company

Zurich American Insurance Company

3Rd Party Defendants

Foster Wheeler LLC

Bayer Cropscience Inc.

Uniroyal Inc.

The Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mickey P. Landry

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Frank J. Swarr

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Matthew C. Clark

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Philip C Hoffman

Attorney at Philip C. Hoffman, LLC

541 Julia Street, Suite 302

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant, Cross Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alexander R Saunders

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alison A. Spindler

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Connor Peth

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Daphne M. Lancaster

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Scott Minyard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Kevin Powell

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

James H. Brown, Jr.

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelly L. Long

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelsey Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Lacey Taylor McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

29 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-06965, M-13 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAEDC-9188590) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) Modified text on 1/20/2022 (lw). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit D

#3

(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (lw) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit A - Part 1

4 #2

Exhibit A - Part 2

4 #3

Exhibit A - Part 3

#5

(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. and Huntington Ingalls Corporation for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David) Modified text on 2/4/2022 (lw). (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#7

(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 3/18/2022 (lw). (Entered: 03/18/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 3/18/2022 (lw). (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. and Huntington Ingalls Corporation for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David) Modified text on 2/4/2022 (lw). (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (lw) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-06965, M-13 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAEDC-9188590) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) Modified text on 1/20/2022 (lw). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avondale Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lamorak Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust is a litigant