This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:15:21 (UTC).

Busby et al v. Smith et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Busby filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Jeffery S. Frensley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01136

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amanda Busby

David Hays

Defendants

Robert Smith

DNCJB LLC

Interested Party

Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew C. Hardin

Attorney at Matt Hardin Law, PLLC

207 23Rd Avenue North

Nashville, TN 37203

Defendant Attorney

John Roy Tarpley

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Nashville)

424 Church Street, Suite 2500, P.O. Box 198615

Nashville, TN 37219

Interested Party Attorney

Brenda Measells Dowdle

Attorney at Schulman, LeRoy & Bennett

P O Box 190676, 501 Union Street, Suite 701

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Reschedule the Initial Case Management Conference by DNCJB LLC. (Tarpley, John) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons issued as to DNCJB LLC, Robert Smith, and Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Roy Tarpley on behalf of DNCJB LLC (Tarpley, John) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Amanda Busby, David Hays. The State of Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance accepted service on behalf of Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company on 1/21/2020. (mg) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby rescheduled for March 17, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/7/2020. (mg) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DNCJB LLC, Robert Smith (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3052167), filed by Amanda Busby, David Hays. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company.(Dowdle, Brenda) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (mg) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company.(Dowdle, Brenda) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby rescheduled for March 17, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/7/2020. (mg) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for John Roy Tarpley. (mg) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Reschedule the Initial Case Management Conference by DNCJB LLC. (Tarpley, John) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Roy Tarpley on behalf of DNCJB LLC (Tarpley, John) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Amanda Busby, David Hays. The State of Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance accepted service on behalf of Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company on 1/21/2020. (mg) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to DNCJB LLC, Robert Smith, and Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Matthew C. Hardin. (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DNCJB LLC, Robert Smith (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3052167), filed by Amanda Busby, David Hays. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.