This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:52:45 (UTC).

Burwell v. USAA General Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Burwell filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USAA General Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00239

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regina Burwell

Raleigh, NC 27605

Defendant

USAA General Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Henry Jessup, IV

Attorney at Howard, Stallings, From, Atkins, Angell & Davis, P.A.

P.O. Box 12347

Raleigh, NC 27607

Defendant Attorney

Torin Fury

Attorney at Frazier Hill & Fury, RLLP

P. O. Box 1559, 500 W. Friendly Ave., Suite 100

Greensboro, NC 27401

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by USAA General Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent USAA for USAA General Indemnity Company. (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Removal-Superior Court

#10

(#10) ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice filed by USAA General Indemnity Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to A

#7

(#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Henry Jessup, IV on behalf of Regina Burwell. (Jessup, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Amended Complaint

#3

(#3) Notice filed by USAA General Indemnity Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/13/2020. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Torin Fury on behalf of USAA General Indemnity Company. (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. USAA General Indemnity Company answer due 1/11/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/6/2019. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA General Indemnity Company from Superior Court Brunswick County, North Carolina, case number 19-CVS-1880. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5211705), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal-Superior Court) (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Robert H. Jessup of Howard Stalling, From, Atkins, Angell, & Davis P.A. at Post Office Box 12347, Raleigh, NC 27605 mailed via US Mail on December 6, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/13/2020. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. USAA General Indemnity Company answer due 1/11/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/6/2019. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Henry Jessup, IV on behalf of Regina Burwell. (Jessup, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Robert H. Jessup of Howard Stalling, From, Atkins, Angell, & Davis P.A. at Post Office Box 12347, Raleigh, NC 27605 mailed via US Mail on December 6, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by USAA General Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent USAA for USAA General Indemnity Company. (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice filed by USAA General Indemnity Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice filed by USAA General Indemnity Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Torin Fury on behalf of USAA General Indemnity Company. (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA General Indemnity Company from Superior Court Brunswick County, North Carolina, case number 19-CVS-1880. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5211705), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal-Superior Court) (Fury, Torin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.