This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 08:30:00 (UTC).

Burton v. Jackson et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Burton filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Jackson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee P. Rudofsky and J. Thomas Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00973

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee P. Rudofsky

Referral Judge

J. Thomas Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffery Burton

Grady, AR 71644-0600

Defendants

Jackson

Shipman

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffery Burton. (kdr) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jeffery Burton.(kdr) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#3

(#3) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 IFP application; directing monthly payments be collected from plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been paid; and directing the clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Varner Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/22/2021. (kdr) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Burton a 1983 complaint form that is labeled "Amended Complaint;" and directing Burton to within, 30 days of the date of this Order, file an Amended Complaint that complies with the directions in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/10/2021. (kdr) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jeffery Burton. (llg) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jeffery Burton. (llg) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Burton a 1983 complaint form that is labeled "Amended Complaint;" and directing Burton to within, 30 days of the date of this Order, file an Amended Complaint that complies with the directions in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/10/2021. (kdr) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 IFP application; directing monthly payments be collected from plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been paid; and directing the clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Varner Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/22/2021. (kdr) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jeffery Burton.(kdr) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffery Burton. (kdr) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shipman is a litigant

Latest cases where JACKSON is a litigant