This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 08:26:41 (UTC).

Burton v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Burton filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Sedwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00004

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Sedwick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Burton

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

C. R. Bard, Inc.

Tissue Science Laboratories Limited

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lee B. Balefsky

Attorney at KLINE & SPECTER

The Nineteenth Floor, 1525 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Michelle L. Tiger

Attorney at KLINE & SPECTER

The Nineteenth Floor, 1525 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Christopher A. Gomez

Attorney at KLINE & SPECTER

1525 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

Kasey Mitchell Adams

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

William M. Gage

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

David B. Thomas

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Christopher D. Morris

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Susan M. Robinson

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Christy D. Jones

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Anita Modak-Truran

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

Suite 1600, 150 Third Avenue South

Nashville, TN 37201

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH

Suite 1700, 201 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

Melissa Foster Bird

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH

P. O. Box 1856

Huntington, WV 25719-1856

Deborah A. Moeller

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY BACON

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2639784. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Service Under Delayed Filing Agreement) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 09/04/2013)

1 #2

Notice of Service Under Delayed Filing Agreement

#2

(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 85 (AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DELAYED FILING AND APPLICATION TO THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS) entered on 08/29/2013 in MDL 2187 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2013)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Richard B. North, Jr. on 9/12/2013. C. R. Bard, Inc. waiver mailed on 9/5/2013, answer due 11/4/2013. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 09/13/2013)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 09/26/2013)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 10/01/2013)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Melissa Foster Bird on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Bird, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 10/04/2013)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Deborah A. Moeller on behalf of Tissue Science Laboratories Limited. (Moeller, Deborah) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/27/2013)

#41

(#41) Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-22539. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

41 #1

*Restricted*

40 #5

Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7177 - Notice of Adoption

40 #6

Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7183 - Reply in Further Support of Mot

40 #3

Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7123 - Notice of Adoption

40 #4

Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7143 - Notice of Adoption

40 #1

Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7118 - Notice of Adoption

40 #2

Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7119 - Notice of Adoption

#40

(#40) JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7118 - Notice of Adoption, #2 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7119 - Notice of Adoption, #3 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7123 - Notice of Adoption, #4 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7143 - Notice of Adoption, #5 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7177 - Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7183 - Reply in Further Support of Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/31/2019)

158 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-22539. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7118 - Notice of Adoption, #2 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7119 - Notice of Adoption, #3 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7123 - Notice of Adoption, #4 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7143 - Notice of Adoption, #5 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7177 - Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7183 - Reply in Further Support of Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #5482 - Response Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #5548 - Reply in Support of Defs Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6648 - Notice of Adoption, #4 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6821 - Notice of Adoption, #5 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6824 - Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6833 - Amended Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6840 - Notice of Adoption, #8 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6852 - Notice of Adoption, #9 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6860 - Notice of Adoption, #10 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6863 - Notice of Adoption, #11 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6864 - Notice of Adoption, #12 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6874 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6875 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6926 - Notice of Adoption, #15 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6958 - Notice of Adoption, #16 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6960 - Notice of Adoption, #17 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6965 - Notice of Adoption, #18 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6973 - Notice of Adoption, #19 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6985 - Notice of Adoption, #20 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6993 - Notice of Adoption, #21 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6998 - Notice of Adoption, #22 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7038 - Notice of Adoption, #23 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7045 - Plfs Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7085 - Amended Adoption of Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7100 - Notice of Adoption)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2931 - Memo by All Plfs in Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2942 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2949 - Memo by All Plfs in Opposition to Defs Motion, #4 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3017 - Reply by Ethicon in Support of Motion to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3024 - Reply by Ethicon in Support of Motion to Exclude, #6 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3051 - Plfs Reply to Motion To Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3053 - Reply by All Plfs in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3619 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #9 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3619 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3621 - Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3626 Part 1 - Motion to Limit, #12 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3626 Part 2 - Motion to Limit, #13 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3630 - Memo in Support of Motion to Limit, #14 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 1 - Response by Defs Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 2 - Response by Defs Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 3 - Response by Defs Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 4 - Response by Defs Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3790 Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3790 Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #20 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3790 Part 3 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #21 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3844 - Reply to Notice of Adoption, #22 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3855 - Reply in Support of Motion to Limit, #23 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3865 - Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #5332 - Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions, #25 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #5333 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filer)(mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2134 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2143 - Response to Plfs Amended Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2205 Part 1 - Motion by All Plfs to Exclude, #4 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2205 Part 2 - Motion by All Plfs to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2205 Part 3 - Motion by All Plfs to Exclude, #6 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2206 - Memo in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2232 - Plfs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Daubert Motion, #8 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2234 - Reply by All Plfs in Support of their Motion, #9 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2287 Part 1 - Defs Response in Opposition to Motion, #10 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2287 Part 2 - Defs Response in Opposition to Motion, #11 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2297 - Plfs' Reply to Defs Response, #12 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2417 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2466 - Memo in Support of Plfs Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2488 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2552 Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2552 Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2552 Part 3 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2759 - Defs Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2760 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #20 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2817 - Defs Motion to Exclude, #21 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2818 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2825 - Motion to Exclude or Limit, #23 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2826 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude or Limit, #24 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2910 - Notice of Response and Adoption, #25 Exhibit ECF #2927 - Response by Ethicon in Opposition)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filer)(mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #238 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit ECF #239 - Master Answer and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit ECF #241 - Master Answer and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit ECF #262 - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF #263 - Amended Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF #1986 - Amended Motion by All Plfs to Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF #1988 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF #2041 - Plfs' Motion to Exclude, #9 Exhibit ECF #2043 - Memo in Support of Plfs Motion to Exclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #12 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 4 - Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 5 - Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 6 - Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 7 - Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 8 - Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 9 - Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 10 - Motion to Exclude, #20 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 11 - Motion to Exclude, #21 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 12 - Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 13 - Motion to Exclude, #23 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 14 - Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #2060 - Motion by All Plfs to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #2065 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 1/09/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 1/08/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/19/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Barbara Burton (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Barbara Burton against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 04/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER (Dismissing Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Covidien Entities with Prejudice And Transferring Cases to MDL 2327) granting the Joint Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants with Prejudice filed in MDL 2187 by plaintiffs, identified on the attached Exhibit A, and to the extent they are named, C. R. Bard, Inc., and Sofradim Production SAS, Tissue Science Laboratories Limited, and Covidien LP, seeking dismissal of Bard and the Covidien entities from these actions with prejudice because all claims between them have been compromised and settled; Plaintiffs' Counsel is DIRECTED to file the appropriate Amended Short Form Complaints within the time frame outlined in the Motion; Defendants Bard and Covidien are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as defendants in the actions listed in Exhibit A, these actions are TRANSFERRED to MDL 2327, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to disassociate these civil actions as member cases in MDL 2187 and re-associate them with MDL 2327. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/29/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Deborah A. Moeller on behalf of Tissue Science Laboratories Limited. (Moeller, Deborah) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Melissa Foster Bird on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Bird, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 10/04/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 10/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 09/26/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Richard B. North, Jr. on 9/12/2013. C. R. Bard, Inc. waiver mailed on 9/5/2013, answer due 11/4/2013. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 09/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 85 (AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DELAYED FILING AND APPLICATION TO THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS) entered on 08/29/2013 in MDL 2187 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2639784. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Service Under Delayed Filing Agreement) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 09/04/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.