This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:18:31 (UTC).

Burton v. Fundmerica Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Burton filed an Other lawsuit against Fundmerica Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael D. Nelson and John M. Gerrard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00119

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

Presiding Judge

John M. Gerrard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Burton

Defendants

FUNDMERICA INC.

KENNETH MANESSE

DIRECT FUNDING NOW LLC

MARIE RUBIN

Fundmerica, Inc.

3900 Birch Street, Suite 110

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Robert Beebe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark L. Javitch

Attorney at MARK JAVITCH

210 South Ellsworth Avenue, Suite 486

San Mateo, CA 94010

Defendant Attorney

Alain J. Chorbajian

Attorney at VATCHE, CHORBAJIAN LAW FIRM

6006 El Tordo Road, Suite 207

Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067-0661

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall have until July 19, 2019, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed as to defendant Marie Rubin pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#26

(#26) Summons Issued as to defendant Robert Beebe regarding Amended Complaint #23 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#23

(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Fundmerica, Inc., Robert Beebe, by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Jeffrey Burton(Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Marie Rubin by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey Burton (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to defendants Direct Funding Now LLC, Fundmerica, Inc., Kenneth Manesse and Marie Rubin. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Requested as to Defendant KENNETH MANESSE regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Requested as to Defendant FUNDMERICA INC. regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Defendants)(Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) Summons Requested as to Defendant MARIE RUBIN regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Summons Issued as to defendant Robert Beebe regarding Amended Complaint #23 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) TEXT ORDER: On #22 plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, the plaintiff's claims against defendant Marie Rubin are dismissed without prejudice. Rubin is terminated as a party. The show cause deadline set by the Court's Order to Show Cause #21 is satisfied. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD) (Entered: 07/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Summons Requested as to Robert Beebe regarding Amended Complaint #23 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Fundmerica, Inc., Robert Beebe, by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Jeffrey Burton(Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Marie Rubin by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey Burton (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall have until July 19, 2019, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed as to defendant Marie Rubin pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) TEXT ORDER: On #18 plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, the plaintiff's claims against defendant Kenneth Manesse are dismissed with prejudice, both parties to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Manesse is terminated as a party. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) TEXT ORDER: On #17 plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, the plaintiff's claims against defendant Direct Funding Now LLC are dismissed with prejudice, both parties to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Direct Funding Now LLC is terminated as a party. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Kenneth Manesse by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey Burton (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Direct Funding Now, LLC by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey Burton (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to defendants Direct Funding Now LLC, Fundmerica, Inc., Kenneth Manesse and Marie Rubin. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Requested as to Defendant MARIE RUBIN regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Requested as to Defendant KENNETH MANESSE regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Requested as to Defendant FUNDMERICA INC. regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Requested as to Defendant DIRECT FUNDING NOW LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • (#5) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #3 for attorney Mark L. Javitch. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3894320 by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey Burton.(Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Defendants)(Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3894313), by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Jeffrey Burton (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Javitch, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less